Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2841267

EP2841267 - SHRINK FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.11.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.12.2015  [2015/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avery Dennison Corporation
150 North Orange Grove Blvd.
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
[N/P]
Former [2015/10]For all designated states
Avery Dennison Corporation
150 North Orange Grove Bvld.
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JANOUSEK, Paul
c/o Avery Dennison Corporation
150 N. Orange Grove Blvd.
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
02 / ZAIKOV, Vadim
c/o Avery Dennison Corporation
150 N. Orange Grove Blvd.
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
03 / GHIAM, Farid
c/o Avery Dennison Corporation
150 N. Orange Grove Blvd.
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
04 / QUATTLEBAUM, Robert, W.
c/o Avery Dennison Corporation
150 N. Orange Grove Blvd.
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
05 / MUELLER, Walter, B.
c/o Avery Dennison Corporation
150 N. Orange Grove Blvd.
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
 [2015/10]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
[2015/10]
Application number, filing date13721514.126.04.2013
WO2013US38355
Priority number, dateUS201261638697P26.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261638697 P
[2015/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013163511
Date:31.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2841267
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013
[2015/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/08, B32B27/32, B32B27/36
[2015/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/10]
TitleGerman:SCHRUMPFFOLIE[2015/10]
English:SHRINK FILM[2015/10]
French:PELLICULE RÉTRACTABLE[2015/10]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2014National basic fee paid 
24.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/10]
15.06.2015Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
16.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/51]
27.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2015/51]
27.07.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007050605  (CRYOVAC INC [US]; OPUSZKO SLAWOMIR [US]; COOK HUBERT J [US]; HERRAN VI) [X] 1-43 * page 18, line 6 * * page 20, line 14 - line 18 * * page 20, line 20 - page 21, line 14 * * example 2; table 1 *;
 [X]WO2008100550  (CRYOVAC INC [US]; MCALLISTER LARRY B [US]; OPUSZKO SLAWOMIR [US]) [X] 1-43 * page 2, line 17 - line 27 * * page 19, line 21 * * page 21, line 29 - line 33 * * page 22, line 4 - page 23, line 2 * * examples 1-3,6; tables 1,2 *;
 [X]WO2006071826  (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]; BLACKWELL CHRISTOPHER J [US]; HENDERSON KEVI) [X] 1-43 * page 15, line 32 - page 16, line 34; figure 2 * * page 17, line 33 - line 34 *;
 [X]WO0027631  (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [X] 1-43 * page 5, line 4 - line 12 * * page 12, line 15 - page 13, line 18 *;
 [X]EP1752285  (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC [JP]) [X] 1-43 * page 11, line 4 - line 15 * * page 11, paragraph 81 * * page 12, paragraphs 87,90 * * page 13, line 52 - page 14, line 8 * * page 18, line 0124; examples B-1; claim -; tables 3,4 *;
 [A]WO2011002148
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 10, Database accession no. 2011-A52765, XP002711869 & WO2011002148 A2 20110106 (DONG IL CHEM INC LTD) [A] 1-43 * abstract *
by applicantUS5264532
 US5164444
 US5623011
 US6306982
 US5705551
 US5232958
 US3239478
 US3251905
 US3390207
 US3598887
 US4219627
 US3639521
 US4208356
 US3113986
 US4226952
 US5190609
    - "Crystallinity Determination", Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1986), vol. 4, pages 482 - 520
    - ARKON, ARAKAWA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD
    - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1988), vol. 13
    - Polymer Science and Technology, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1964), vol. 1
    - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1985), vol. 2, pages 325 - 326
    - J. E. MCGRATH, Block Copolymers, Science Technology, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1979), pages 1 - 5