Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2856559

EP2856559 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR HAVING POKE-IN WIRE CONTACT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.06.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Former [2015/15]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRANDBERG, Philip Clay
131 Wagner Street
Carlisle, Pennsylvania 17013-1250 / US
02 / HOWARD, Edward John
1344 State Route 25
Millersburg, Pennsylvania 17061-8110 / US
03 / MORGAN, Ivan Philip
615 Gap Road
Lewisberry, Pennsylvania 17339-9507 / US
04 / KOCHER, Timothy Lee
364 Futurity Drive
Camp Hill, Pennsylvania 17011 / US
 [2015/15]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date13721545.502.05.2013
WO2013US39235
Priority number, dateUS20121348138025.05.2012         Original published format: US201213481380
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013176859
Date:28.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2856559
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013
[2015/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/48, H01R13/193
[2015/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER MIT EINEM STECKDRAHTKONTAKT[2015/15]
English:ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR HAVING POKE-IN WIRE CONTACT[2015/15]
French:CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE À CONTACT PAR INSERTION D'UN FIL[2015/15]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2014National basic fee paid 
06.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/15]
20.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.06.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6244904  (FABIAN DAVID JAMES [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,7-10 * column 1, line 48 - line 60 * * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 42; figures 2,6,9 * [I] 5,6;
 [X]DE102008039232  (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0042]; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]US5324213  (FRANTZ ROBERT H [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 61; figure 6 *;
 [A]EP0675568  (BITRON SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 5; figure 1 *