Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2845413

EP2845413 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A CONNECTED MODE WITH REDUCED SIGNALING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2019/32]
Former [2015/11]For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RADULESCU, Andrei Dragos
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / PRAKASH, Rajat
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / TINNAKORNSRISUPHAP, Peerapol
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / SINGH, Damanjit
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
05 / PATEL, Chirag Sureshbhai
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2015/11]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2019/32]
Former [2015/11]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13722243.602.05.2013
[2019/32]
WO2013US39336
Priority number, dateUS201261641797P02.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261641797 P
US20131379799112.03.2013         Original published format: US201313797991
[2015/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013166330
Date:07.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2845413
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2845413
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/00
[2015/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINEN VERBUNDENEN MODUS MIT REDUZIERTER SIGNALGEBUNG[2015/11]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A CONNECTED MODE WITH REDUCED SIGNALING[2015/11]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UN MODE CONNECTÉ AVEC SIGNALISATION RÉDUITE[2015/11]
Entry into regional phase03.10.2014National basic fee paid 
03.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/11]
18.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2019Fee for grant paid
24.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19161262.1  / EP3512250
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.07.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
07.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[IY]WO2009135931  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]; MAHESHWARI SHASHIKANT [US]; SAIFULLAH) [I] 1,27,30,59,74,78 * paragraphs [0029] - [0032] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0042] , [0057] , [0058] * * paragraphs [0073] - [0079]; figures 3,6 * [Y] 2-26,28,29,31-58,60-73,75-77,79-92;
 [Y]WO2011160059  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]; ADJAKPLE PASCAL M [US]; WATFA MAHMO) [Y] 2-26,28,29,31-58,60-73,75-77,79-92 * paragraphs [0002] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0062] - [0065] * * paragraphs [0076] , [0083] *;
 [A]US2010069094  (CHIN TOM [US] ET AL) [A] 1-92 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056] *;
 [AD]  - "3GPP TS 36.300 V8.5.0 (2008-05) 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall Description; Stage 2 (Release 8)", 3GPP TS 36.300 V8.5.0,, (20080501), vol. 36.300, no. V8.5.0, pages 1 - 134, XP002532523 [AD] 1-92 * chapter 10.1.2 *