Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2827767

EP2827767 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A VISUAL REPRESENTATION OF SLEEP QUALITY BASED ON ECG SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BABAEIZADEH, Saeed
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / ZHOU, Sophia, Huai
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Steffen, Thomas
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13722534.818.03.2013
WO2013IB52142
Priority number, dateUS201261613637P21.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261613637 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013140324
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2827767
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/0402
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER VISUELLEN DARSTELLUNG DER SCHLAFQUALITÄT AUF DER BASIS VON EKG-SIGNALEN[2015/05]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A VISUAL REPRESENTATION OF SLEEP QUALITY BASED ON ECG SIGNALS[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONSTRUCTION D'UNE REPRÉSENTATION VISUELLE DE LA QUALITÉ DU SOMMEIL BASÉE SUR DES SIGNAUX D'ECG[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase21.10.2014National basic fee paid 
21.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
02.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US2008058659  (AL-ABED MOHAMMAD A [US] ET AL) [X] 1-26 * figures 1,3A-3D,4A-4B,5 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0015] - [0032] - [0087] - [0090] * * claims 1-20 *;
 [A]US2005267362  (MIETUS JOSEPH E [US] ET AL) [A] 1-26 * figures 2,4,6-11 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] - [0045] *;
 [A]US2006235315  (AKSELROD SOLANGE [IL] ET AL) [A] 1-26 * figures 20a,20b * * paragraph [0407] - paragraph [0432] * * claims 107-119 *;
 [A]US2006041201  (BEHBEHANI KHOSROW [US] ET AL) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *