Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830688

EP2830688 - STARTING PRESSURE FOR RESPIRATORY THERAPY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU, SM
published on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2015/06]
Inventor(s)01 / MATHEWS, Gregory, Delano
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / SHELLY, Benjamin, Irwin
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / ROSSLER, Heather, Dawn
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / KANE, Michael, Thomas
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
05 / D'ANGELO, Mark, Dominic
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
06 / ZACHARY, Paul, Dean
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/06]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2019/01]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2015/06]Steffen, Thomas
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13722544.726.03.2013
[2019/01]
WO2013IB52382
Priority number, dateUS201261617881P30.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261617881 P
[2015/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013144827
Date:03.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830688
Date:04.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013
[2015/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2830688
Date:02.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/00
[2015/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STARTDRUCK FÜR ATEMWEGSTHERAPIEVORRICHTUNGEN[2015/06]
English:STARTING PRESSURE FOR RESPIRATORY THERAPY DEVICES[2015/06]
French:PRESSION INITIALE POUR DISPOSITIFS DE TRAITEMENT RESPIRATOIRE[2015/06]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2014National basic fee paid 
30.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/06]
14.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2018Fee for grant paid
23.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2016
Opposition(s)03.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL02.01.2019
AT02.01.2019
CZ02.01.2019
DK02.01.2019
EE02.01.2019
ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
IT02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RO02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
SK02.01.2019
SM02.01.2019
LU26.03.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/49]AL02.01.2019
AT02.01.2019
CZ02.01.2019
DK02.01.2019
EE02.01.2019
ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
IT02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RO02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
SK02.01.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/48]AT02.01.2019
DK02.01.2019
ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
IT02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/46]AT02.01.2019
ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
IT02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
NO02.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
NO02.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
NO02.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL02.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011155134  (FARRUGIA STEVEN PAUL [AU]) [X] 1-3,11-13 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0050] * [I] 4,5,14,15;
 [XI]US2010049008  (DOHERTY RENEE FRANCIS [AU] ET AL) [X] 1-3,11-13 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0127] * [I] 4,5,14,15;
 [XI]US2009038616  (MULCAHY DAVID [AU] ET AL) [X] 1-3,11-13 * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0081] * [I] 4,5,14,15;
 [XI]US6401713  (HILL PETER D [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,11-13 * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0039] * [I] 4,5,14,15;
 [XI]US2007221224  (PITTMAN STEPHEN D [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,11-13 * figures 1-15 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0086] * [I] 4,5,14,15;
 [XI]US2002056452  (BREWER GREGORY NEWTON [AU] ET AL) [X] 1-3,11-13 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0070] * [I] 4,5,14,15;
 [XI]WO2012024733  (RESMED LTD [AU]; MULQUEENY QESTRA CAMILLE [AU]; TASSAUX DIDIER [FR]) [X] 1-3,11-13 * figures 1-10 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052] * [I] 4,5,14,15;
 [XI]US2009173347  (BERTHON-JONES MICHAEL [AU]) [X] 1,3,11,13 * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0116] * [I] 2,4,5,12,14,15;
 [A]US2009205662  (KWOK PHILIP RODNEY [AU] ET AL) [A] 1-5,11-15 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0110] *
ExaminationUS2007142741