blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2850607

EP2850607 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CREATING A CURRENT SITUATION DEPICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG
Guerickestr. 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2018/38]
Former [2015/13]For all designated states
Continental Teves AG&Co. Ohg
Guerickestraße 7
60488 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / STRAUSS, Matthias
Seeheimer Straße 158 A
64319 Pfungstadt / DE
02 / STÄHLIN, Ulrich
Lübecker Straße 4
65760 Eschborn / DE
 [2015/13]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2019/28]
Application number, filing date13722727.806.05.2013
[2019/28]
WO2013EP59397
Priority number, dateDE20121020825416.05.2012         Original published format: DE102012208254
[2015/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013171088
Date:21.11.2013
Language:DE
[2013/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2850607
Date:25.03.2015
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2850607
Date:10.07.2019
Language:DE
[2019/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.11.2013
ClassificationIPC:G08G1/01, G08G1/0967
[2015/13]
CPC:
G08G1/0112 (EP,CN,KR,US); G01C11/04 (KR); G08G1/096741 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G08G1/096775 (EP,CN,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERSTELLUNG EINES AKTUELLEN SITUATIONSABBILDS[2015/13]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CREATING A CURRENT SITUATION DEPICTION[2015/13]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CRÉATION D'UNE REPRÉSENTATION ACTUELLE D'UNE SITUATION[2015/13]
Entry into regional phase16.12.2014National basic fee paid 
16.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/13]
01.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2019Fee for grant paid
15.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.12.2016
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.05.2013
AL10.07.2019
CY10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
MK10.07.2019
MT10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
AT06.05.2020
IE06.05.2020
LU06.05.2020
BE31.05.2020
CH31.05.2020
LI31.05.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU06.05.2013
AL10.07.2019
CY10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
MT10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
AT06.05.2020
IE06.05.2020
LU06.05.2020
BE31.05.2020
CH31.05.2020
LI31.05.2020
Former [2021/37]AL10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
AT06.05.2020
IE06.05.2020
LU06.05.2020
BE31.05.2020
CH31.05.2020
LI31.05.2020
Former [2021/24]AL10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
IE06.05.2020
LU06.05.2020
BE31.05.2020
CH31.05.2020
LI31.05.2020
Former [2021/20]AL10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
IE06.05.2020
LU06.05.2020
CH31.05.2020
LI31.05.2020
Former [2021/15]AL10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
LU06.05.2020
CH31.05.2020
LI31.05.2020
Former [2021/12]AL10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
CH31.05.2020
LI31.05.2020
Former [2021/07]AL10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
CH31.05.2020
LI31.05.2020
Former [2020/37]AL10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SI10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/36]AL10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/27]AL10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
PT11.11.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/25]AL10.07.2019
CZ10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SK10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
PT11.11.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/24]AL10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
PT11.11.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/23]AL10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
IT10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
PL10.07.2019
RO10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/22]AL10.07.2019
DK10.07.2019
EE10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/17]AL10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
TR10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/15]AL10.07.2019
ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/12]ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
IS10.11.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/11]ES10.07.2019
FI10.07.2019
HR10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
LV10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
GR11.10.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/10]FI10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
BG10.10.2019
NO10.10.2019
PT11.11.2019
Former [2020/09]FI10.07.2019
LT10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
NO10.10.2019
Former [2020/08]LT10.07.2019
NL10.07.2019
NO10.10.2019
Former [2020/07]NL10.07.2019
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1321742  (ZF LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044]; figure 1 * [Y] 3-6;
 [X]EP1921588  (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,8-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] *;
 [Y]WO0208695  (GEDAS TELEMATICS GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 5,6 * page 3, line 16 - line 33 * * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 4 * * page 7, line 4 - line 14 *;
 [Y]US5173691  (SUMNER ROY L [US]) [Y] 3,4 * column 8, line 62 - column 10, line 36 *;
 [X]US2009138190  (KULIK VICTOR [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0069] *;
 [X]DE102006010572  (LAUCHE GERHARD [DE]) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0002] *
ExaminationDE19513640
by applicantDE102008060869
 DE102007048809
 DE102009008959
 DE102008012660
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.