Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2948095

EP2948095 - PROCEDURE FOR DENTAL AESTHETIC ANALYSIS OF THE SMILE AREA AND FOR FACILITATING THE IDENTIFICATION OF DENTAL AESTHETIC TREATMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2020New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amato, Aldo
via R. Lambrushini 4
35133 Padova / IT
[2015/49]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/49]
Representative(s)Vinci, Marcello
Ufficio Veneto Brevetti Via Sorio 116
35141 Padova / IT
[2015/49]
Application number, filing date13722816.904.02.2013
[2015/49]
WO2013IB50925
Priority number, dateIT2013PD0001023.01.2013         Original published format: IT PD20130010
[2015/49]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014114991
Date:31.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2948095
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014
[2015/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61C7/00, G06F19/00
[2015/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DENTALEN ÄSTHETISCHEN ANALYSE DES LÄCHELBEREICHS UND ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DER IDENTIFIKATION DENTALER ÄSTHETISCHER BEHANDLUNGEN[2015/49]
English:PROCEDURE FOR DENTAL AESTHETIC ANALYSIS OF THE SMILE AREA AND FOR FACILITATING THE IDENTIFICATION OF DENTAL AESTHETIC TREATMENTS[2015/49]
French:PROCÉDURE D'ANALYSE ESTHÉTIQUE DENTAIRE DE LA ZONE DU SOURIRE ET D'IDENTIFICATION FACILE DES TRAITEMENTS ESTHÉTIQUES DENTAIRES[2015/49]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2015National basic fee paid 
10.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/49]
04.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2019Date of oral proceedings
19.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
19.07.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination14.10.2019Appeal received No.  T2942/19
29.11.2019Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US7013191  (RUBBERT RUEDGER [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2004197727  (SACHDEVA ROHIT [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *