Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2854750

EP2854750 - TRPA1 ANTAGONISTS FOR REDUCING NEGATIVE SENSATIONS CAUSED BY HYDROGEN PEROXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/15]COMPOSITION FOR REDUCTION OF TRPA1 AND TRPV1 SENSATIONS
[2019/18]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.05.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2015/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HAUGHT, John, Christian
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
02 / SREEKRISHNA, Koti Tatachar
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
03 / DAS, Sourav
5A/9 Prerana Apartments
Bediadanga 2nd Lane
PS Kasba
Kolkata 700039 / IN
04 / HOKE, Steven, Hamilton, II
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
05 / COFFINDAFFER, Timothy, Woodrow
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
06 / BAKES, Katharine, Anne
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
07 / GLANDORF, William, Michael
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
 [2015/15]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]Joos, Uta Susanne , et al
P&G Manufacturing GmbH
Frankfurter Straße 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
Application number, filing date13722969.609.05.2013
WO2013US40293
Priority number, dateUS201261652035P25.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261652035 P
US201261682887P14.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261682887 P
US20131387374930.04.2013         Original published format: US201313873749
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013176897
Date:28.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2854750
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013
[2015/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.05.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/22, A61K8/33, A61K8/34, A61K8/35, A61K8/368, A61K8/37, A61K8/41, A61K8/42, A61K8/49, A61K8/92, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/10, A61Q9/02, A61Q11/00
[2017/32]
Former International [2015/15]A61K8/42, A61Q5/10, A61K8/30, A61Q11/00, A61K8/37, A61K8/35
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
TitleGerman:TRPA1 ANTAGONISTEN ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON WASSERSTOFF PEROXID VERURSACHTEN NEGATIVEN EMPFINDUNGEN[2019/18]
English:TRPA1 ANTAGONISTS FOR REDUCING NEGATIVE SENSATIONS CAUSED BY HYDROGEN PEROXIDE[2019/18]
French:ANTAGONISTS DE TRPA1 POUR RÉDUIRE DES SENSATIONS NÉGATIVES CAUSÉES PAR LE PÉROXYDE D'HYDROGÈNE[2019/23]
Former [2015/15]ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON TRPA1- UND TRPV1-EMPFINDUNGEN
Former [2015/15]COMPOSITION FOR REDUCTION OF TRPA1 AND TRPV1 SENSATIONS
Former [2015/15]COMPOSITION POUR LA RÉDUCTION DES SENSATIONS DE TRPA1 ET TRPV1
Entry into regional phase04.11.2014National basic fee paid 
04.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/15]
03.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2017/32]
11.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)EP15192727.4  / EP2998001
EP19168381.2  / EP3533436
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.07.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]JP2012062304  (MANDOM CORP) [X] 1,3,4,9-12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0006] , [0026] , [0036] , [0037] , [0067] - [0093] - [0135] - [0147] - [0151] , [0158] , [0159] , [0167] * [Y] 1-4,8-12,14,15;
 [XY]WO2010062835  (PERIO SCIENCES LLC [US]; ZIELINSKI JAN [US]; MOON RUSSELL P [US]; ALLE) [X] 1-4,8-12 * page 22, line 19 - line 25 * * page 33 - page 37; example 2 * [Y] 1-4,8-12,14,15
by applicantJP2011136953
 JPH0665044B
 US2011104301
 US2008153845
 WO2009087242
 US2009098213
 WO2011034868
 CA2567189
 US3535421
 US3678154
 US5004597
 US5578293
 US5281410
 US4206215
 US2946725
 US4051234
 US5180577
 US4459425
 GB1315626
 US4029759
 US5608119
 US6956139
 US4136163
 US4150052
 US4153679
 US4157384
 US4178459
 US4230688
 WO2005049553
 WO2006103401
 US7189760
 EP0310299
 US3111127
 US3917613
 US3991178
 US5703123
 US5725865
 US5843466
 US6365215
 US6451844
 US6884903
 US5266592
 US5977166
 US5451404
 US6592884
 US4070496
 US3070510
 US3538230
 US3862307
 US4340583
 US5589160
 US5603920
 US5651958
 US5658553
 US5716601
    - G. WASNER ET AL., BRAIN, (2004), vol. 127, pages 1159 - 1171
    - K. HILL; M. SCHAEFER, CELL CALCIUM, (2009), vol. 45, pages 155 - 164
    - RENNER; SCHREIBER, EXP. BRAIN RES., (2012), vol. 217, pages 1 - 14
    - P BARALDI ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2010), vol. 53, pages 5085 - 5107
    - CRAIG; BUSHNELL, SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 265, pages 252 - 5
    - YOSHIDA ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2010), vol. 51, pages 5134 - 5136
    - MACPHERSON ET AL., NATURE, (2007), vol. 445, pages 541 - 545
    - International Cosmetics Ingredient Dictionary and Handbook 8th ed.;, THE COSMETICS, TOILETRY, AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION, vol. 2
    - HU, HONGZHEN ET AL., NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 183 - 190
    - R. EMBERGER; R. HOPP, "Synthesis and Sensory Characterization of Menthol Enantiomers and Their Derivatives for the Use in Nature Identical Peppermint Oils", SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, (1987), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 193 - 201
    - WEI ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1983), vol. 35, pages 110 - 112
    - H. R. WATSON ET AL., J. SOC. COSMET. CHEM., (1978), vol. 29, pages 185 - 200
    - R. ECCLES, J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1994), vol. 46, pages 618 - 630
    - SMART ET AL., "Characterization using FLIPR of human vanilloid VR1 receptor pharmacology", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (2001), vol. 417, pages 51 - 58
    - LIU ET AL., "Development and validation of a platelet calcium flux assay using a fluorescent imaging plate reader", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 357, pages 216 - 224
    - SMART ET AL., "Characterization using FLIPR of human vanilloid VR receptor pharmacology", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (2001), vol. 417, pages 51 - 58