Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2847176

EP2847176 - POLYMORPHIC SALT OF THE OXALATE SALT OF 6 - O - ( 4 - DIMETHYLAMINOETHOXY) CINNARNOYL FUMAGILLOL AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.04.2017  [2017/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zafgen, Inc.
175 Portland Street
4th Floor
Boston, MA 02114 / US
[2016/07]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
Zafgen, Inc.
One Broadway, 8th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CRAWFORD, Thomas
13 Clark Lane
Essex, CT 06426 / US
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)Harris, Jennifer Lucy , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/12]Harris, Jennifer Lucy , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date13723369.807.05.2013
WO2013US39877
Priority number, dateUS201261643586P07.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261643586 P
[2015/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013169727
Date:14.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2847176
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013
[2015/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D303/22, A61P3/04, A61K31/336
[2015/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/12]
Extension statesBA26.11.2014
ME26.11.2014
TitleGerman:POLYMORPHES SALZ DES OXALATSALZES VON 6-O-(4-DIMETHYLAMINOETHOXY-)CINNARNOYL-FUMAGILLOL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2015/12]
English:POLYMORPHIC SALT OF THE OXALATE SALT OF 6 - O - ( 4 - DIMETHYLAMINOETHOXY) CINNARNOYL FUMAGILLOL AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME[2015/12]
French:SEL POLYMORPHE DE SEL D'OXALATE DE 6-O-(4-DIMETHYLAMINOETHOXY) CINNARNOYL FUMAGILLOL ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION[2015/12]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2014National basic fee paid 
26.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/12]
19.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/17]
15.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/17]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2011088055  (ZAFGEN CORP [US]; HUGHES THOMAS E [US]) [A] 1-18 * examples 6,7,8,9 *;
 [A]WO2010065883  (ZAFGEN CORP [US]; HUGHES THOMAS E [US]; VATH JAMES E [US]) [A] 1-18 * claims 51,52 *;
 [A]WO2005082349  (CHONG KUN DANG PHARM CORP [KR]; LEE SANG-JOON [KR]; AHN SOON-KIL [KR];) [A] 1-18 * page 5, line 9 - line 11 * * page 8, line 14 * * examples 3,6,9,10; claim 3 *;
 [A]  - EUN-JOO KIM ET AL, "General Pharmacology of CKD-732, a New Anticancer Agent: Effects on Central Nervous, Cardiovascular, and Respiratory System", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (20050101), vol. 28, no. 2, doi:10.1248/bpb.28.217, ISSN 0918-6158, pages 217 - 223, XP055072403 [A] 1-18 * page 217, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/bpb.28.217
by applicant   - WARDER ET AL., J PROTEOME RES, (2008), vol. 7, page 4807
    - WANG ET AL., CANCER RES, (2003), vol. 63, page 7861
    - ZHANG ET AL., J. BIOMED SCI., (2002), vol. 9, page 34
    - RUPNICK ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, page 10730