Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2850708

EP2850708 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOCALIZING AND QUENCHING AN ARC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS, SK
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMA Solar Technology AG
Sonnenallee 1
34266 Niestetal / DE
[2015/13]
Inventor(s)01 / BEHRENDS, Holger
Denkmalstrasse 1
26817 Rhauderfehn / DE
02 / KRATOCHVIL, Marcel
Philosophenweg 6
34121 Kassel / DE
03 / HOPF, Markus
Fuldaweg 11
34314 Espenau / DE
 [2018/52]
Former [2015/13]01 / BEHRENDS, Holger
Unterer Nordendweg 6
34128 Kassel / DE
02 / KRATOCHVIL, Marcel
Friedrich-Ebert-Str. 88
34119 Kassel / DE
03 / HOPF, Markus
Gangloffsömmerner Ring 18
34314 Espenau / DE
Representative(s)Lahnor, Peter
SMA Solar Technology AG
Corporate Intellectual Property Management
Sonnenallee 1
34266 Niestetal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/52]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2015/13]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13723775.617.05.2013
[2018/52]
WO2013EP60243
Priority number, dateDE20121010431418.05.2012         Original published format: DE102012104314
[2015/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013171329
Date:21.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2850708
Date:25.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013
[2015/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2850708
Date:26.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/02, H02H1/00, H02H7/20, H02J3/38, H02H7/26, G01R31/12
[2018/30]
Former International [2015/13]H02H1/00, G01R31/12, H02H7/20, H02J3/38, H02H7/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR LOKALISIERUNG UND LÖSCHEN EINES LICHTBOGENS[2015/13]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOCALIZING AND QUENCHING AN ARC[2015/13]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE LOCALISATION ET D'EXTINCTION D'UN ARC[2015/13]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2014National basic fee paid 
05.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/13]
23.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.10.2018Fee for grant paid
10.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.11.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
14.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/37]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/25]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/24]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/23]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Cited inInternational search[XPAI]US2012253533  (EIZIPS DANIEL [US] ET AL) [XP] 1-3,8,9,11-13 * the whole document * [A] 7 [I] 4-6,10;
 [XP]US2012318320  (ROBBINS STEVEN ANDREW [US]) [XP] 1-3,12,13 * the whole document *;
 [XY]US2011267721  (CHAINTREUIL NICOLAS [FR] ET AL) [X] 1,8,12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0010] - [0027] - [0 64] , [0 68] - [0075] * [Y] 2-7,9-11;
 [Y]GB2348751  (SQUARE D CO [US]) [Y] 2-7,9-11 * abstract * * page 8, line 8 - page 13, line 38 *
by applicantDE102011000737
 DE10155795