EP2870392 - VALVE DEVICE FOR A HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT AND OIL PUMP CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/20] | VALVE DEVICE FOR A HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT AND OIL PUMP REGULATOR ARRANGEMENT | ||
[2018/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierburg GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAPPAN, Rolf Mauenheimer Strasse 10 50733 Köln / DE | 02 /
SADOWSKI, Christoph Gedulderweg 139a 45549 Sprockhövel / DE | 03 /
ROMANOWSKI, Lukas Schwerinerstr. 11 49090 Osnabrück / DE | 04 /
YILMAZ, Turgut Escherstr. 239 50739 Köln / DE | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | terpatent Patentanwälte und European Patent Attorneys ter Smitten Eberlein -Van Hoof Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein-Van Hoof Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2015/20] | Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13723815.0 | 22.05.2013 | [2018/51] | WO2013EP60474 | Priority number, date | DE201210105972 | 04.07.2012 Original published format: DE102012105972 | [2015/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014005758 | Date: | 09.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2870392 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2870392 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06, F01M1/16 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
F01M1/16 (EP);
F16K31/0613 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/20] | F16K11/07, F16K31/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN HYDRAULIKKREISLAUF SOWIE ÖLPUMPENREGELANORDNUNG | [2015/20] | English: | VALVE DEVICE FOR A HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT AND OIL PUMP CONTROL SYSTEM | [2018/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION POUR UN CIRCUIT HYDRAULIQUE ET SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE DE POMPE A HUILE | [2018/30] |
Former [2015/20] | VALVE DEVICE FOR A HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT AND OIL PUMP REGULATOR ARRANGEMENT | ||
Former [2015/20] | DISPOSITIF À VANNE POUR UN CIRCUIT HYDRAULIQUE ET SYSTÈME DE RÉGULATION DE POMPE À HUILE | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 10.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2013 | AL | 19.12.2018 | CY | 19.12.2018 | CZ | 19.12.2018 | DK | 19.12.2018 | EE | 19.12.2018 | ES | 19.12.2018 | FI | 19.12.2018 | HR | 19.12.2018 | IT | 19.12.2018 | LT | 19.12.2018 | LV | 19.12.2018 | MC | 19.12.2018 | MK | 19.12.2018 | MT | 19.12.2018 | NL | 19.12.2018 | PL | 19.12.2018 | RO | 19.12.2018 | RS | 19.12.2018 | SE | 19.12.2018 | SI | 19.12.2018 | SK | 19.12.2018 | SM | 19.12.2018 | TR | 19.12.2018 | BG | 19.03.2019 | NO | 19.03.2019 | GR | 20.03.2019 | IS | 19.04.2019 | PT | 19.04.2019 | AT | 22.05.2019 | IE | 22.05.2019 | LU | 22.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.05.2013 | |
AL | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
MT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.05.2013 | |
AL | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
IE | 22.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 19.12.2018 | |
NO | 19.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4071042 (LOMBARD CLAUDE EDMOND, et al) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 38 - column 7, line 31; figures 1-6b * [I] 6-15; | [XI]DE3402119 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 32; figure 1 * [I] 5-15; | [XI]US4579145 (LEIBER HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 16; figures 1-3 * [I] 6-15; | [XI]US4744389 (ICHIHASHI KOUJI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 48; figure 1 * [I] 4-15; | [XI]DE4231998 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 22 - column 7, line 48; figures 1,2 * [I] 6-15; | [XI]DE4324589 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 33 - column 7, line 53; figures 1-3 * [I] 6-15; | [XI]DE19829549 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 45 - column 4, line 19; figures 1-6 * [I] 5-15; | [XI]US2002007857 (LOU ZHENG DAVID [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-3 *[I] 4-15 | by applicant | DE10110174 | DE10330779 | DE112008000978T |