Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2844640

EP2844640 - UREA PRODUCTION PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK, SM
published on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
31.05.2019Opposition filedpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stamicarbon B.V.
Mercator 3
6135 KW Sittard / NL
[2015/11]
Inventor(s)01 / MENNEN, Johannes Henricus
c/o Mercator 3
6135 KW Sittard / NL
02 / MEESSEN, Jozef Hubert
c/o Mercator 3
6135 KW Sittard / NL
 [2018/35]
Former [2015/11]01 / MENNEN, Johannes Henricus
c/o Mercator 3
NL-6135 KW Sittard / NL
02 / MEESSEN, Jozef Hubert
c/o Mercator 3
NL-6135 KW Sittard / NL
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/35]
Former [2015/11]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13724000.802.05.2013
[2018/35]
WO2013NL50328
Priority number, dateEP2012016657503.05.2012         Original published format: EP 12166575
[2015/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013165245
Date:07.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2844640
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2844640
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07C273/04
[2015/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HARNSTOFFHERSTELLUNGSANLAGE[2015/11]
English:UREA PRODUCTION PLANT[2015/11]
French:INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D'URÉE[2018/12]
Former [2015/11]USINE DE PRODUCTION D'URÉE
Entry into regional phase18.11.2014National basic fee paid 
18.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/11]
11.05.2015Observations by third parties
17.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2016Observations by third parties
08.03.2016Observations by third parties
10.05.2016Observations by third parties
04.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2017Observations by third parties
06.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2018Fee for grant paid
16.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18190962.3  / EP3459932
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.11.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.05.2019   
thyssenkrupp Fertilizer Technolgy GmbH
Vosskuhle 38
44141 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
 [2019/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/23]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT29.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2009043365  (UREA CASALE SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 9 - page 14; figure -; example -; claim - * * abstract *;
 [X]WO2006004424  (YARA INT ASA [NO], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 15 - page 21; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US4613697  (PAGANI GIORGIO [IT]) [X] 1-6 * figure -; example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO03087043  (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract *
by applicant   - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, (1996), vol. A27, pages 333 - 350