Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2844421

EP2844421 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY FOR A POOL REACTOR OR POOL CONDENSER ; CORRESPONDING TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/11]METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY FOR A POOL REACTOR OR POOL CONDENSER; CORRESPONDING TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY
[2016/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stamicarbon B.V.
Mercator 3
6135 KW Sittard / NL
[2015/11]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHEERDER, Alexander Aleida Antonius
c/o Mercator 3
NL-6135 KW Sittard / NL
 [2015/11]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2016/23]
Former [2015/11]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13724003.202.05.2013
[2016/23]
WO2013NL50331
Priority number, dateEP2012016658403.05.2012         Original published format: EP 12166584
[2015/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013165247
Date:07.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2844421
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2844421
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B23K31/02, B01J19/02, B01J19/24, C07C273/04, F28F9/18, F28F19/06
[2015/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES SCHLAUCHBLATTES UND WÄRMETAUSCHERANORDNUNG ; ENTSPRECHENDE SCHLAUCHBLATT UND WÄRMETAUSCHERANODNUNG[2016/01]
English:METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY FOR A POOL REACTOR OR POOL CONDENSER ; CORRESPONDING TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY[2016/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUE TUBULAIRE ET ENSEMBLE ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE POUR UN RÉACTEUR OU CONDENSATEUR DE PISCINE ; PLAQUE TUBULAIRE ET ENSEMBLE ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE CORRESPONDANTS[2016/01]
Former [2015/11]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ROHRBODENS UND WÄRMETAUSCHERANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN POOLREAKTOR ODER POOLKONDENSATOR
Former [2015/11]METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY FOR A POOL REACTOR OR POOL CONDENSER; CORRESPONDING TUBE SHEET AND HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY
Former [2015/11]PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUE ALVÉOLÉE ET D'UN ENSEMBLE D'ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE DESTINÉ À UN RÉACTEUR PISCINE OU UN CONDENSEUR PISCINE; PLAQUE ALVÉOLÉE ET ENSEMBLE D'ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE CORRESPONDANTS
Entry into regional phase18.11.2014National basic fee paid 
18.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/11]
10.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2016Fee for grant paid
13.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.12.2015
Opposition(s)09.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.05.2013
AL08.06.2016
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
[2019/31]
Former [2018/46]AL08.06.2016
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2018/06]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
Former [2016/52]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
Former [2016/49]FI08.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2006073086  (SAKAI KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 14] , [0041] , [0043] , [0050]; figure -; claims 1,3 *;
 [Y]US4288109  (ELLIS CLAUDE E) [Y] 1-16 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 12; figure - *;
 [Y]JPH0285696  (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [Y] 9,10,15 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2008065478  (BELLELI ENERGY CPE S P A [IT], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]US2003066868  (EIJKENBOOM JOSEPH MARIA GERARD [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
by applicantWO2009141346