Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2847404

EP2847404 - BALANCED HINGE DEVICE WITH BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C.M.I. Cerniere Meccaniche Industriali S.r.L.
Via 2 Agosto 1980, 1/D
Loc. Crespellano
40053 Valsamoggia (BO) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2016/29]For all designated states
C.M.I. Cerniere Meccaniche Industriali S.r.L.
Via 2 Agosto 1980
1/D Loc. Crespellano
40053 Valsamoggia (BO) / IT
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
C.M.I. Cerniere Meccaniche Industriali S.r.L.
Via 2 Agosto 1980 1/D
40056 Crespellano (BO) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / GHERARDI, Eros
Via Laura Bassi Veratti 1
I-40137 Bologna / IT
 [2016/28]
Former [2015/12]01 / GHERARDI, Eros
Via Laura Bassi 1
I-40137 Bologna / IT
Representative(s)Negrini, Elena
Agazzani & Associati S.r.l. Via dell'Angelo Custode 11/6
40141 Bologna / IT
[2015/12]
Application number, filing date13724772.208.05.2013
[2016/28]
WO2013EP59680
Priority number, dateIT2012BO0025709.05.2012         Original published format: IT BO20120257
[2015/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013167708
Date:14.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2847404
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2847404
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/28]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2847404
Date:12.10.2016
[2016/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:E05F1/12, F24C15/02, A47L15/42, E05D11/08
[2015/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSGLEICHSSCHARNIERVORRICHTUNG MIT BREMSE[2016/06]
English:BALANCED HINGE DEVICE WITH BRAKE[2015/12]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CHARNIÈRE ÉQUILIBRÉE AVEC FREIN[2016/06]
Former [2015/12]AUSGEGLICHENE SCHARNIERVORRICHTUNG MIT BREMSE
Former [2015/12]DISPOSITIF DE CHARNIÈRE ÉQUILIBRÉ À FREIN
Entry into regional phase09.12.2014National basic fee paid 
09.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/12]
28.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
27.05.2016Fee for grant paid
27.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.01.2016
Opposition(s)18.04.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.05.2013
AL13.07.2016
AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
MK13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
[2019/51]
Former [2019/48]HU08.05.2013
AL13.07.2016
AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2019/31]HU08.05.2013
AL13.07.2016
AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2018/46]AL13.07.2016
AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2018/06]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/10]BE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT13.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1302150  (CMI SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US3820866  (KALDENBERG H) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - line 16; figure 1 *