Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2847940

EP2847940 - POWER LINE NON- LIGHTING APPLICATION CONTROLLER SYSTEM COMPRISING A LIGHT FIXTURE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.10.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.11.2018  [2018/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lumenpulse Lighting Inc.
1220 Marie-Victorin Blvd.
Longueuil, QC J4G 2H9 / CA
[2018/41]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
Lumenpulse Lighting Inc.
1751 Rue Richardson Suite 1505
Montreal, QC H3K 1G6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / CAMPBELL, Gregory
17 Joal Avenue
Walpole, Massachusetts 02081 / US
02 / HAMEL, Yvan
2265 Boul. Des Oiseaux
Laval, Québec H7L 6A8 / CA
03 / RACINE, Philippe
1124 boulevard su Millenaire
Saint-Basile-le-Grand, Québec J3N 1T6 / CA
04 / SOUVAY, Francois-Xavier
663 Bosquet Street
Boucherville J4B 8V9 / CA
05 / LILLEY, Jesse
4280 Blvd Maisonneuve
Montreal, Québec H3Z 1K6 / CA
 [2015/15]
Former [2015/12]01 / CAMPBELL, Gregory
17 Joal Avenue
Walpole, Massachusetts 02081 / US
02 / HAMEL, Yvan
2265 Boul. Des Oiseaux
Laval, Québec H7L 6A8 / CA
03 / RACINE, Philippe
1124 boulevard su Millenaire
Saint-Basile-le-Grand, Québec J3N 1T6 / CA
04 / SOUVAY, Francois-Xavier
1751 rue Richardson
Montreal, Québec H3K 1G6 / CA
05 / LILLEY, Jesse
4280 Blvd Maisonneuve
Montreal, Québec H3Z 1K6 / CA
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/12]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date13724962.906.05.2013
WO2013US39642
Priority number, dateUS201261643632P07.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261643632 P
[2015/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013169624
Date:14.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2847940
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013
[2015/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, F21V33/00, H05B37/02
[2015/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/12]
TitleGerman:STROMLEITUNGSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR NICHTBELEUCHTUNGSANWENDUNG MIT EINER LEUCHTE SOWIE VERFAHREN[2015/12]
English:POWER LINE NON- LIGHTING APPLICATION CONTROLLER SYSTEM COMPRISING A LIGHT FIXTURE AND METHOD[2015/12]
French:SYSTÈME DE DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'APPLICATION AUTRE QUE D'ÉCLAIRAGE PAR LIGNE ÉLECTRIQUE COMPRENANT UN APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET PROCÉDÉ[2015/12]
Entry into regional phase07.10.2014National basic fee paid 
07.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/12]
20.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/48]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2003210340  (FREDERICK ROMANOWICH JOHN [US]) [X] 1,9,16 * abstract * * figures 11, 13, 14 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * [I] 1-19;
 [I]US2006033454  (MATHEWS DAVID K [US] ET AL) [I] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO2009014880  (LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO [US]; CERASUOLO MARK [US]) [I] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0033] *;
 [A]KR20090022573  (GOLDENCHIPS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0034] *;
 [XPI]FR2973622  (AWOX [FR]) [XP] 1,9,16 * the whole document * [I] 1-19