Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813954

EP2813954 - INFORMATION SEARCH APPARATUS AND INFORMATION SEARCH METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT Docomo, Inc.
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / IIZUKA Shinya
c/o Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO INC.
Sanno Park Tower
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date13725264.925.01.2013
WO2013JP51632
Priority number, dateJP2012002539608.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012025396
[2014/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118592
Date:15.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813954
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, // G10L15/183, G10L15/08
[2016/26]
Former International [2014/51]G06F17/30, G10L15/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSSUCHVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSSUCHVERFAHREN[2014/51]
English:INFORMATION SEARCH APPARATUS AND INFORMATION SEARCH METHOD[2014/51]
French:APPAREIL DE RECHERCHE D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE RECHERCHE D'INFORMATIONS[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2013Translation filed 
06.06.2013National basic fee paid 
06.06.2013Search fee paid 
06.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/51]
16.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.10.2019
08.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
30.10.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
06.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010023509  (ADACHI NORITAKA [JP], et al) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] , [0039] - [0057] *;
 [I]US2009083029  (DOI MIWAKO [JP], et al) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0063] - [0066] - [0104] - [0147] *
 [I]  - BAEZA-YATES R ET AL, MODERN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, Chapter 2: Modeling, MODERN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, PAGE(S) COMPLETE58, (19990101), ISBN 978-0-201-39829-8, XP002299413 [I] 1-9 * Section 2.6 and in particular paragraph "Fuzzy Information Retrieval"; page 35 - page 38 * * section 2.1 *
International search[A]JP2010033197  (INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP.)
 [A]  - AKI KATO ET AL., "Evaluation of spotting algorithm constrained by keyword co-occurrence for dialogue systems", IEICE TECHNICAL REPORT (SP2010-88 TO SP2010-102), (20101213), vol. 110, no. 357, pages 25 - 30, XP008171660
 [A]  - DAEWOO KIM ET AL., "Language Models and Dialogue Strategies for Realization of a Voice QA system", DAI 40 KAI REPORTS OF THE MEETING OF SPECIAL INTERNET GROUP ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE UNDERSTANDING AND DIALOGUE PROCESSING(SIG-SLUD- A303), (20040305), pages 7 - 12, XP055137564
 [A]  - SHIN'YA IIZUKA ET AL., "Technology Reports, Tanmatsu Kino ya Service no Ribensei Kojo no Tameno Onsei Ninshiki Gijutsu to Application Kaihatsu", NTT DOCOMO TECHNICAL JOURNAL, (20120101), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 74 - 78, XP008168628