Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2841136

EP2841136 - PORTABLE HANDHELD PRESSURE SUPPORT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/10]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / MAHADEVAN, Anandi
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / BROUQUEYRE, Laurent
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / LUCCI, Christopher Scott
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/10]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/10]Steffen, Thomas
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13726302.623.04.2013
WO2013IB53187
Priority number, dateUS201261637586P24.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261637586 P
[2015/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013160822
Date:31.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2841136
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013
[2015/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/00
[2015/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/10]
TitleGerman:TRAGBARES DRUCKUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2015/10]
English:PORTABLE HANDHELD PRESSURE SUPPORT SYSTEM AND METHOD[2015/10]
French:SYSTÈME DE SUPPORT DE PRESSION PORTATIF PORTABLE ET PROCÉDÉ[2015/10]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2014National basic fee paid 
24.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/10]
23.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.10.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.05.2018Request for further processing filed
29.05.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.06.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5398676  (PRESS ROMAN J [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,11,13-15 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 49; figures 2,3 * * column 2, lines 4-9 * * column 8, lines 4-15; figure 5 * * column 9, lines 30-40 * [Y] 2,12;
 [Y]US2005051168  (DEVRIES DOUGLAS F [US], et al) [Y] 2,12 * paragraph [0031]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2011203587  (BERTINETTI MARK [AU], et al) [A] 1-5,11-15 * paragraphs [0061] - [0068] - [0072] , [0087] , [0088]; figures 2-5 *