blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2854861


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
22.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
04.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.02.2019  [2019/06]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
10.08.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
01.09.2017 (Expected) grant published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
01.09.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
01.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.05.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.04.2017 Change - classification published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
07.04.2017 Change - classification published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
27.02.2017 Change - representative
21.12.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.06.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.05.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.04.2016 First examination report
07.08.2015 Change - extension states published on  09.09.2015  [2015/37]
24.07.2015 Change - applicant published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
24.07.2015 Change - inventor published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
22.07.2015 Amendment by applicant
31.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
06.03.2015 Request for examination filed published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
29.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
10.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
18.12.2014 Change - representative
18.12.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
06.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication