blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2854861 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380040262 EP13726846



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019282534Global Dossier 19.09.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
US201916429726 03.06.2019
US201414404773 01.12.2014
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
US201615392370 28.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10307390Global Dossier 04.06.2019B2
US2017112796 27.04.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
US201414404773 01.12.2014
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
US201615392370 28.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9567405Global Dossier 14.02.2017B2
US2015191551 09.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
US201314404773 31.05.2013
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6130910BGlobal Dossier 17.05.2017B2
JP2015518041 25.06.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104703628BGlobal Dossier 08.09.2017B
CN104703628 10.06.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2854861Global Dossier 04.10.2017B1
EP2854861 08.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013269340B 17.08.2017B9
AU2013269340B 16.02.2017B2
AU2013269340 12.03.2015A8
AU2013269340 22.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014029841 27.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2875063 05.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2854861T 02.01.2018T3
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2653248T 06.02.2018T3
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN10764DELNP2014 04.09.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2854861T 28.02.2018T3
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
EP13726846 31.05.2013
WO2013GB51458 31.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013179057Global Dossier 05.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6385511BGlobal Dossier 05.09.2018B2
JP2017141288 17.08.2017A
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE038055T 29.10.2018T2
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NO2882932T 04.08.2018T3
Priority number Date
US201261654277 01.06.2012