Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2854861

EP2854861 - METHOD OF SYNTHESISING SULFORAPHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PharmAgra Labs, Inc.
158 McLean Road
Brevard, NC 28712 / US
[2017/40]
Former [2015/35]For all designated states
Pharmagra Labs, Inc.
40 McLean Road
Brevard, NC 28712 / US
Former [2015/15]For all designated states
Pharmagra Labs, Inc.
158 McLean Road
Brevard, North Carolina 28801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DAMIREDDI, Sahadeva Reddy
140 Eagle Ridge Drive
Waverly, Iowa 50677 / US
02 / AKUE, Kpakpo Ambroise
2112 Saratoga Drive
Columbia, Missouri 65201 / US
03 / NELSON, Jared K.
492 Falls Creek Road
Pisgah Forest, North Carolina 28768 / US
04 / FRISBEE, Albert Roger
68 Chestnut Stump Road
Hendersonville, North Carolina 28792 / US
05 / NEWSOME, Peter Wyatt
130 Old Souther Road
Horseshoe, North Carolina 28742 / US
 [2015/35]
Former [2015/15]01 / DAMIREDDI, Sahadeva Reddy
209 Cambridge Drive
Brevard, North Carolina 28712 / US
02 / AKUE, Kpakpo Ambroise
501 Kensington Place D
Asheville, North Carolina 28803 / US
03 / NELSON, Jared K.
492 Falls Creek Road
Pisgah Forest, North Carolina 28768 / US
04 / FRISBEE, Albert Roger
68 Chestnut Stump Road
Hendersonville, North Carolina 28792 / US
05 / NEWSOME, Peter Wyatt
130 Old Souther Road
Horseshoe, North Carolina 28742 / US
Representative(s)HGF Limited
4th Floor
Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[2017/40]
Former [2015/15]Wells, Andrew
HGF Limited
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
Application number, filing date13726846.231.05.2013
[2017/40]
WO2013GB51458
Priority number, dateUS201261654277P01.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261654277 P
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013179057
Date:05.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2854861
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013
[2015/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2854861
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07C331/20, C08B37/16, C08L5/16
[2017/19]
Former International [2015/15]A61K47/48, A61K31/26, C07C331/20, C08B37/16, C08L5/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON SULFORAPHAN[2015/15]
English:METHOD OF SYNTHESISING SULFORAPHANE[2015/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE DU SULFORAPHANE[2015/15]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2014National basic fee paid 
17.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/15]
21.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2017Fee for grant paid
24.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.04.2016
Opposition(s)05.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
16.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
IE31.05.2018
LU31.05.2018
[2019/19]
Former [2019/17]EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
LU31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/52]EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/40]EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/37]EE04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/24]FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2008091608  (PHARMAGRA LABS INC [US], et al) [X] 16-19 * claims 1,2,21-37 * * page 1, lines 23,24 * * page 9, lines 26-30 * * page 10, line 28 * * page 29, lines 9-17 * * page 9; table 1 * [Y] 1-19;
 CN102423492  [ ] (GUANGHUI XIAO) [ ] * paragraphs [0002] , [0022] , [0023] * * examples 3-8 *;
 [P]CN102688219  (JIANHUA MA) [P] * paragraphs [0004] , [0014] * * claim 5 *;
 [X]  - WU H ET AL, "Preparation and stability investigation of the inclusion complex of sulforaphane with hydroxypropyl-beta-cyclodextrin", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, vol. 82, no. 3, ISSN 0144-8617, (20101015), pages 613 - 617, (20100521), XP027206323 [X] 16-19 * page 614, column 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 616, column 2, conclusion *
 [X]  - XIAO, GUANGHUI ET AL, "Inclusion compound of sulforaphane", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2012:616578, URL: STN, XP002710430 [X] 16-19 * abstract *
 [X]  - MA, JIANHUA, "Microencapsulation of sulforaphane from crucifer seeds as health food additive", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2012:1420050, URL: STN, XP002710431 [X] 16-19 * abstract *
 [Y]  - HOLLAND, HERBERT L. ET AL, "Biotransformation of organic sulfides. Part 7. Formation of chiral isothiocyanato sulfoxides and related compounds by microbial biotransformation", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, 6(7), 1569 -74 CODEN: TASYE3; ISSN: 0957-4166, (1995), XP002710034 [Y] 1-19 * page 1569, paragraph last * * page 1570; compound 2a * * page 1573, paragraphs 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0957-4166(95)00200-9
 [A]  - H. SCHMID ET AL, "Synthese der racemischen und der optisch aktiven Formen des Sulforaphans", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (19480101), vol. 31, no. 6, doi:10.1002/hlca.19480310608, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 1497 - 1505, XP055074316 [A] 1,16-19 * page 1502, line 22 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19480310608
 [A]  - ALESSIO PAPI ET AL, "Cytotoxic and Antioxidant Activity of 4-Methylthio-3-butenyl Isothiocyanate from Raphanus sativus L. (Kaiware Daikon) Sprouts", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20080201), vol. 56, no. 3, doi:10.1021/jf073123c, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 875 - 883, XP055074320 [A] 1,16-19 * page 879, column 1, paragraph last *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf073123c
by applicantWO2008008954
 WO2008015315
 US135618
 CN102249968
 US7879822
    - SCHMID H.; KARRER, P., HELVETICA CHIMICAACTA, (1948), vol. 31, no. 6, pages 1497 - 1505
    - VERMEULEN M; ZWANENBURG B; CHITTENDEN G.J.F; VERHAGEN H, EUR. J. MED. CHEM, (2003), vol. 38, no. 78, pages 729 - 737
    - CONAWAY C.C; WANG C.X; PITTMAN B; YANG Y.M; SCHWARTZ J.E; TIAN D; MCLNTEE E.J; HECHT S.S; CHUNG F.L, CANCER RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 65, no. 18, pages 8548 - 8557
    - KUHNERT N; LU Y, JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS & RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, (2004), vol. 47, no. 8, pages 501 - 507
    - MAYS J. R; RAJSKI, S. R., CHEMBIOCHEM, (2008), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 729 - 747
    - CHRISTOPHER A. D'SOUZA; SHANTU AMIN; DHIMANT DESAI, JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS & RADIOPHAIMACEUTICALS, (2003), vol. 46, no. 9, pages 851 - 859
    - JOON- KWAN M; JUN-RAN K; YOUNG-JOON A; TAKAYUKI S, JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 58, no. 11, pages 6672 - 6677
    - TONG JIAN DING; LING ZHOU; XIAO PING CAO, CHINESE CHEMICAL LETTERS, (2006), vol. 17, no. 9, pages 1152 - 1154
    - XIN CHEN; ZHENGYI LI; XIAOQIANG SUN; HONGZHAO MA; XIAOXIN CHEN; JIE REN; KUN HU, SYNTHESIS, (2011), vol. 24, pages 3991 - 3996
    - VERMEULEN, EUR. J. MED. CHEM, (2003), vol. 38, no. 78, pages 729 - 737
    - D'SOUZA, JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS & RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, (2003), vol. 46, no. 9, pages 851 - 859
    - CAO, CHINESE CHEMICAL LETTERS, (2006), vol. 17, no. 9, pages 1152 - 1154
    - CHEN, SYNTHESIS, (2011), vol. 24, pages 3991 - 3996
    - Goodman & Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, (1996), pages 1707 - 1711