blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2854861 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2854861



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 286
08.08.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.10.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
07.09.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.08.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.08.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
24.08.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.05.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.05.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.05.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.05.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
02.05.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
02.03.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
19.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 24
19.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
19.12.2016 Description Search / examination 23
19.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.06.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
07.06.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
07.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.06.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.04.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.04.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.04.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.08.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
28.07.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.07.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
21.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
21.07.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
21.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
21.07.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
07.04.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
11.03.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.01.2015 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
14.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.12.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.12.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
10.10.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.01.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 36
05.12.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
05.12.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 25
14.08.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
14.08.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
14.08.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
07.06.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
07.06.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 2
07.06.2013 Description International Searching Authority 22