Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2861544

EP2861544 - GROUT FOR TILES COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Litokol S.p.A.
Via G. Falcone 13/1
42048 Rubiera (RE) / IT
[2015/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PASTORELLI, Stefano
Via G. Mazzoli 21
I-42044 Gultieri (RE) / IT
02 / VACCARI, Antonio
Via Provinciale est n.53
I-41015 Nonantola (MO) / IT
 [2015/17]
Representative(s)Negrini, Elena
Agazzani & Associati S.r.l. Via dell'Angelo Custode 11/6
40141 Bologna / IT
[2015/17]
Application number, filing date13727193.806.06.2013
[2016/32]
WO2013EP61737
Priority number, dateIT2012BO0032513.06.2012         Original published format: IT BO20120325
[2015/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013186122
Date:19.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2861544
Date:22.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013
[2015/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2861544
Date:10.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:C04B26/16, C04B20/10
[2015/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
Extension statesBA13.01.2015
ME13.01.2015
TitleGerman:MÖRTEL ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON FLIESEN[2015/17]
English:GROUT FOR TILES COATING[2015/17]
French:RÉNOVATEUR DE JOINTS[2015/17]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2015National basic fee paid 
13.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/17]
03.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2016Fee for grant paid
14.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.03.2016
Opposition(s)11.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.06.2013
AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MK10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
[2019/51]
Former [2019/48]HU06.06.2013
AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2019/31]HU06.06.2013
AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/46]AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/11]AT10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/32]AT10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT10.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2008012641  (LITOKOL S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * pages 2-5 *;
 [A]WO0160883  (CONICA TECHNIK AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006121204  (NAKAE YASUKIHO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0010] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0063] - [0067] * * paragraphs [0136] - [0138] *;
 [A]US2007059530  (ZIEGLER MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1666430  (VOSS STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6562894  (BLUM HARALD [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19953445  (BASF COATINGS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2457938  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *