Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2856679

EP2856679 - FEEDBACK TO ENHANCE RATE PREDICTION WITH BURSTY INTERFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2015/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KRISHNA KUMAR, Raj, Kumar
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / BHATTAD, Kapil
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
03 / GORE, Dhananjay, Ashok
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
04 / WEI, Yongbin
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2015/15]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13727739.821.05.2013
WO2013US42054
Priority number, dateUS201261651879P25.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261651879 P
US20131389839820.05.2013         Original published format: US201313898398
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013177184
Date:28.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2856679
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013
[2015/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04L1/16, H04L1/18
[2015/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
TitleGerman:RÜCKKOPPLUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER RATENVORHERSAGE MIT STOSSWEISER INTERFERENZ[2015/15]
English:FEEDBACK TO ENHANCE RATE PREDICTION WITH BURSTY INTERFERENCE[2015/15]
French:RÉTROACTION PERMETTANT D'AMÉLIORER LA PRÉDICTION DE DÉBIT AVEC INTERFÉRENCES PAR RAFALES[2015/15]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2014National basic fee paid 
29.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/15]
09.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
07.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]EP1871028  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7,16,18-20,29-32,34,35,44,46-48,57-60,62,63,72,74-76,85,86 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0079] * [A] 5,12,33,45,61,73 [Y] 13,21-26,28,41,49-54,56,69,77-82,84 [I] 14,27,42,55,70,83;
 [A]US2005013303  (GOPALAKRISHNAN NANDU [US] ET AL) [A] 1-7,14,16-20,27,29-35,42,44-48,55,57-63,70,72-76,83,85,86 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 28] , [0 35] , [0 41] *;
 [A]US2011271162  (JITSUKAWA DAISUKE [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-7,14,16-20,27,29-35,42,44-48,55,57-63,70,72-76,83,85,86 * paragraphs [0037] , [0 43] , [0 44] , [0 65] , [0 80] *;
 [A]US2007275712  (SEBIRE BENOIST [JP] ET AL) [A] 5,12,33,45,61,73 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 26] , [0 28] , [0 36] , [0 52] , [0 76] *;
 [XY]EP1919231  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 8,36,64 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 33] , [0 40] , [0 42] , [0 43] , [0 51] , [0 52] * [Y] 21,49,77;
 [A]US2012069755  (LI XIAODONG [US] ET AL) [A] 8,21,36,49,64,77 * paragraphs [0026] , [0 43] , [0 61] , [0 62] *;
 [YA]US2011087944  (LI QINGHUA [US] ET AL) [Y] 13,26,41,54,69,82 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 16] , [0 32] , [0 38] , [0 50] , [0 52] , [0 58] * [A] 8,21,36,49,64,77;
 [A]EP2075972  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]) [A] 15,28,43,56,71,84 * paragraphs [0045] , [0 50] , [0 51] *
 [XY]  - Amitabha Ghosh; Rapeepat Ratasuk, Essentials of LTE and LTE-A, Cambridge, UK, Cambridge University Press, (20110804), pages 97 - 108, ISBN 978-0-521-76870-2, XP002712177 [X] 9-12,15,37-40,43,65-68,71 * the whole document * [Y] 22-25,28,50-53,56,78-81,84