Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2861337

EP2861337 - METHOD FOR COOLING A GAS-PHASE REACTOR FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.03.2015
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
[2015/17]
Inventor(s)01 / STRECKER, Holger
Kerpener Strasse 10
53919 Weilerswist / DE
02 / HECKER, Manfred
Dreischlägerstraße 30
53577 Neustadt Wied / DE
03 / KARER, Rainer
Oskar-Schlemmer-Ring 48
67657 Kaiserslautern / DE
04 / HAMANN, Axel
Hemmersbacher Str. 74
50169 Kerpen-Horrem / DE
05 / DE LANGE, Paulus
Starenweg 5
50389 Wesseling / DE
 [2015/17]
Representative(s)Seelert, Stefan , et al
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. E413, 5.OG
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/17]Seelert, Stefan
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. B852, 5th floor
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date13728735.513.06.2013
WO2013EP62236
Priority number, dateEP2012017191114.06.2012         Original published format: EP 12171911
US201261659753P14.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261659753 P
[2015/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013186299
Date:19.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2861337
Date:22.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013
[2015/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01J8/18, C08F10/00, G05D7/06
[2015/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KÜHLUNG EINES GASPHASENREAKTORS ZUR POLYMERISIERUNG VON OLEFINEN[2015/17]
English:METHOD FOR COOLING A GAS-PHASE REACTOR FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS[2015/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN RÉACTEUR EN PHASE GAZEUSE POUR LA POLYMÉRISATION D'OLÉFINES[2015/17]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2014National basic fee paid 
03.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/17]
09.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO0000875  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [YD] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO2005061554  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO9512788  (PHOENIX CONTROLS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * pages 7-10; figures 1A-1D * * claim 1 *;
 [Y]DE19724447  (BUERKERT WERKE GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 43; figures 1, 2 *;
 [Y]US5329965  (GORDON DANIEL J [US]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 8; figure 2 *;
 [Y]DE4216075  (MARTIN UMWELT & ENERGIETECH [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 45; figure 1 * * claim 2 *;
 [Y]WO8605291  (MARCHAL EQUIP AUTO [FR]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 17 *
by applicantEP0516036
 WO0000875
 WO9704015
 WO0002929