Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2856639

EP2856639 - LOW NOISE AMPLIFIERS FOR CARRIER AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2015/15]
Inventor(s)01 / TASIC, Aleksandar Miodrag
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / DAVIERWALLA, Anosh Bomi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2015/15]
Representative(s)Wimmer, Hubert
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[2019/37]
Former [2015/15]Wimmer, Hubert
WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13728878.324.05.2013
[2019/37]
WO2013US42726
Priority number, dateUS201261652064P25.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261652064 P
US20121359042321.08.2012         Original published format: US201213590423
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013177555
Date:28.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2856639
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013
[2015/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2856639
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H03F1/22, H03F3/193, H03F3/68, H03F3/72, H03G3/20, H04L27/26
[2019/02]
Former International [2015/15]H03F1/22, H03F3/193, H03F3/68, H03F3/72
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:RAUSCHARME VERSTÄRKER FÜR TRÄGERAGGREGATION[2015/15]
English:LOW NOISE AMPLIFIERS FOR CARRIER AGGREGATION[2015/15]
French:AMPLIFICATEURS À FAIBLE BRUIT POUR L'AGRÉGATION DE PORTEUSES[2015/15]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2014National basic fee paid 
18.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/15]
29.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.06.2019Fee for grant paid
24.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.07.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
31.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.11.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
04.09.2018Request for further processing filed
04.09.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.09.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
07.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2012056681  (LEE CHIH-HUNG [TW]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11,14,17-20 * figures 2, 4, 7 * [A] 6,12 [I] 9,10;
 [XI]US2011217945  (UEHARA GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13-19 * figures 2b, 3 * [I] 9,10;
 [XI]US2005265084  (CHOI YOUNG-HO [KR]) [X] 1,17,19 * figure 3 * [I] 9,10;
 [XI]US2008116976  (CHANG SUNG-HSIEN [US], et al) [X] 1,17,19 * figure 1 * [I] 9,10