EP2864608 - MOTOR VEHICLE ENGINE COOLING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jaguar Land Rover Limited Abbey Road Whitley Coventry, Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUTCHINS, William c/o Jaguar Land Rover Patents W/1/073 Abbey Road Whitley Coventry, Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB | [2018/01] |
Former [2015/18] | 01 /
HUTCHINS, William Jaguar Land Rover Patents W/1/073 Abbey Road Whitley Coventry Warwickshire CV3 4LF / GB | Representative(s) | Holmes, Matthew William Jaguar Land Rover Patents W/1/073 Abbey Road Whitley, Coventry CV3 4LF / GB | [2015/18] | Application number, filing date | 13728989.8 | 31.05.2013 | [2018/01] | WO2013EP61290 | Priority number, date | GB20120009680 | 31.05.2012 Original published format: GB 201209680 | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013178798 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2864608 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2864608 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/16 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
F01P7/165 (EP,CN,GB,US);
F01P3/02 (US);
F01P7/16 (US);
F01P2003/027 (EP,CN,US);
F01P2005/125 (EP,CN,US);
F01P2007/146 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] |
Former [2015/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLSYSTEM FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGMOTOR UND VERFAHREN | [2015/18] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE ENGINE COOLING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2015/18] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE MOTEUR DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 22.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2013 | AL | 03.01.2018 | AT | 03.01.2018 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | DK | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | ES | 03.01.2018 | FI | 03.01.2018 | HR | 03.01.2018 | IT | 03.01.2018 | LT | 03.01.2018 | LV | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | MK | 03.01.2018 | NL | 03.01.2018 | PL | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | RS | 03.01.2018 | SE | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | SM | 03.01.2018 | TR | 03.01.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | NO | 03.04.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | IE | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | LU | 31.05.2018 | MT | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 31.05.2013 | |
AL | 03.01.2018 | ||
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
LU | 31.05.2018 | ||
MT | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
LU | 31.05.2018 | ||
MT | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
LU | 31.05.2018 | ||
MT | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
LU | 31.05.2018 | ||
MT | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
LU | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
LU | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
LU | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 03.01.2018 | |
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4410133 (FURUKUBO TATSUMI [JP]) [X] 1,8-11,18,19 * column 15, line 66 - column 19, line 2; figures 1,2,3 * * column 21, line 3 - line 55 * * column 23, line 3 - column 29, line 545 * [Y] 2-7,12-17; | [Y]DE19539604 (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [Y] 2-7,12-17 * column 1, lines 1-57; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 2-11 *; | [X]DE102006025064 (BEHR THERMOT TRONIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 18,19 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026]; figure 3 *; | [A]FR2934319 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-19* page 4, line 25 - page 11, line 25; figures 1,6-8 * |