EP2859148 - RAILWAY RAIL FASTENING CLIP AND PAD FOR RECESSED RAILSEATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pandrol Limited 63 Station Road Addlestone, Surrey KT15 2AR / GB | [2015/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARDNER, Christopher 1 Scofton Close Gateford Worksop Nottinghamshire S81 7SG / GB | 02 /
COX, Stephen John 5 Selwyn Avenue Richmond Surrey TW9 2HB / GB | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2015/16] | Application number, filing date | 13729039.1 | 23.04.2013 | WO2013GB51024 | Priority number, date | GB20120010365 | 12.06.2012 Original published format: GB 201210365 | [2015/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013186520 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2859148 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E01B9/30 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
E01B9/303 (EP,CN,GB,US);
E01B9/48 (RU);
E01B9/34 (GB);
E01B9/60 (US);
E01B9/68 (CN,RU);
E01B9/685 (EP,CN,GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Title | German: | EISENBAHNSCHIENENBEFESTIGUNGSKLEMME UND SCHIENENAUFLAGE FÜR VERTIEFTE SCHIENENSITZE | [2015/16] | English: | RAILWAY RAIL FASTENING CLIP AND PAD FOR RECESSED RAILSEATS | [2015/16] | French: | CRAPAUD DE FIXATION DE RAIL DE CHEMIN DE FER ET SEMELLE POUR APPUIS DE RAIL EN CREUX | [2015/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 21.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 18.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/49] | Divisional application(s) | EP15164446.5 / EP2944721 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9312296 (PANDROL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004033724 (VOSSLOH WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]GB2235003 (PANDROL LTD [GB]) [X] 5-11 * the whole document * [A] 12,13; | [X]GB2211231 (PANDROL LTD [GB]) [X] 5 * abstract * |