Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2828137 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2828137



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 249
04.11.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
30.12.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
03.12.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.10.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.10.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
29.10.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.07.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.07.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
29.07.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.07.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
29.07.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 42
24.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
28.10.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
24.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.10.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 9
07.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
28.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.12.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
12.12.2013 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
05.11.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
08.10.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
08.10.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
08.10.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
26.09.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 43