Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2828137


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
29.06.2018 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
17.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
16.12.2016 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
04.11.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
21.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
19.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
22.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
24.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.07.2016  [2016/30]
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
13.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
06.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
22.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
27.11.2015 (Expected) grant published on  30.12.2015  [2015/53]
03.11.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
03.11.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.11.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
28.07.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.06.2015 Change - classification published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Change - classification published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Change - German title published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
22.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
16.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
20.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
26.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
08.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
30.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication