Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2828137
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2828137Global Dossier 30.12.2015B1
EP2828137 28.01.2015A2
Priority number Date
WO2013IT00084 21.03.2013
ITRM20120110 21.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2566388T 12.04.2016T3
Priority number Date
WO2013IT00084 21.03.2013
ITRM20120110 21.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013140429Global Dossier 12.12.2013A3
WO2013140429 26.09.2013A2
Priority number Date
ITRM20120110 21.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ITRM20120110 22.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
ITRM20120110 21.03.2012