Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828137

EP2828137 - MOUNTING DEVICE FOR MOUNTING A PAIR OF BALISES TO A RAILWAY TRACK AND SYSTEM COMPRISING SAID DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ECM S.p.A.
Via IV Novembre 29
Località Cantagrillo
51034 Serravalle Pistoiese (Pistoia) / IT
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / CAPPELLINI, Roberto
c/o ECM S.p.A.
Via IV Novembre 29
Località Cantagrillo
I-51034 Serravalle Pistoiese (Pistoia) / IT
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Carangelo, Pierluigi , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Tomacelli 146
00186 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Carangelo, Pierluigi , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via delle Quattro Fontane, 15
00184 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date13729478.121.03.2013
[2016/01]
WO2013IT00084
Priority number, dateIT2012RM0011021.03.2012         Original published format: IT RM20120110
[2015/05]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013140429
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2828137
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828137
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/53]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:B61L3/12, // E01B29/32, B61L27/00
[2015/31]
Former International [2015/05]B61L3/12, E01B26/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR MONTAGE EINES BALISENPAARES AM GLEIS UND SYSTEM MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG[2015/31]
English:MOUNTING DEVICE FOR MOUNTING A PAIR OF BALISES TO A RAILWAY TRACK AND SYSTEM COMPRISING SAID DEVICE[2015/05]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE POUR MONTER UNE PAIRE DE BALISES SUR UNE LIGNE DE CHEMIN DE FER ET SYSTÈME COMPRENANT LEDIT DISPOSITIF[2015/05]
Former [2015/05]MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG ZUR MONTAGE EINES BALISENPAARS AUF EINER EISENBAHNSCHIENE UND SYSTEM MIT DIESER VORRICHTUNG
Entry into regional phase28.08.2014National basic fee paid 
28.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
15.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2015Fee for grant paid
29.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.07.2015
Opposition(s)03.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.03.2013
AL30.12.2015
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU21.03.2013
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2018/38]HU21.03.2013
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2018/31]HU21.03.2013
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2018/30]HU21.03.2013
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
MT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/47]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/16]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/07]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE21.03.2016
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/47]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU21.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/30]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT30.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2885916  (CSEE TRANSP SARL [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 26 * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 5 * * page 12, line 1 - page 24, line 15 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]WO2011141119  (DB NETZ AG [DE]; SCHLOEGL ANDREAS [DE]; VAIHINGER STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1-14 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 7; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE202007004297U  (DIEPA DRAHTSEILWERK DIETZ GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] - [0010] - [0015]; figure . *;
 [A]GB2390721  (RAIL PROD DESIGN LTD [GB]) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 14; figures 1-2 *;
 [A]WO2008092921  (SIEMENS AG [DE]; SCHOENEBERG ANDREAS [DE]; BRUER HUBERTUS [DE]; OPP WO) [A] 10 * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 4 *;
 [A]EP0793191  (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 10 * column 2, line 29 - column 2, line 47; figure 2 *
 [A]  - HENRY J-L, "LE KVB AU SOL", REVUE GENERALE DES CHEMINS DE FER, CENTRALE DES REVUES DUNOD-GAUTHIER-VILLARS. PARIS, FR, (20001201), ISSN 0035-3183, pages 21 - 33, XP001246778 [A] 1-14 * pages 28-29; figure 11 *