Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2854887

EP2854887 - COATING OF BALLOON CATHETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): RO
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aachen Scientific International PTE. LTD.
10 Anson Road
03-05 International Plaza
079903 Singapore / SG
[2018/02]
Former [2017/25]For all designated states
Rübben, Alexander
6 Lacets Saint Leon
98000 Monaco / MC
For all designated states
Aachen Scientific International PTE. LTD.
10 Anson Road
03-05 International Plaza
079903 Singapore / SG
Former [2017/20]For all designated states
Aachen Scientific International PTE. LTD.
10 Anson Road
03-05 International Plaza
079903 Singapore / SG
Former [2015/15]For all designated states
Rübben, Alexander
6 Lacets Saint Leon
98000 Monaco / MC
Inventor(s)01 / Rübben Alexander
6 Lacets Saint Leon
98000 Monaco / MC
 [2017/20]
Former [2015/15]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Schöneborn, Holger
Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB
Rechts- und Patentanwälte
Huestraße 23
(Kortumkarree)
44787 Bochum / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]Schöneborn, Holger
Schneiders & Behrendt
Rechts- und Patentanwälte
Huestraße 23
(Westfalenbankgebäude)
44787 Bochum / DE
Application number, filing date13729622.403.06.2013
[2017/42]
WO2013EP61352
Priority number, dateDE2012101080001.06.2012         Original published format: DE102012010800
[2015/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013178820
Date:05.12.2013
Language:DE
[2013/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2854887
Date:08.04.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013
[2015/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2854887
Date:18.10.2017
Language:DE
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61L29/08, A61L29/16
[2015/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BESCHICHTUNG VON BALLONKATHETERN[2015/15]
English:COATING OF BALLOON CATHETERS[2015/15]
French:REVÊTEMENT DE CATHÉTER À BALLONNET[2015/15]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2015National basic fee paid 
05.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/15]
24.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2017Fee for grant paid
04.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17190859.3  / EP3287152
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.04.2017
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
[2018/40]
Former [2018/37]CZ18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]DE102007003184  (ORLOWSKI MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,20 *;
 [I]DE102008034826  (RUEBBEN ALEXANDER [DE]) [I] 1-9,11-15 * page 2, paragraphs 6-11 * * page 3, paragraph 13 * * claims 1,2,15 *
by applicantUS5102402
 US6129705
 WO2010009904