Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2864425

EP2864425 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A SILICA-COVERED CARBON-BASED SPECIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
23 place des Carmes-Déchaux
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
[2018/44]
Former [2018/22]For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
12 Cours Sablon
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
Former [2017/29]For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
12 Cours Sablon
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
Former [2015/18]For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
12 Cours Sablon
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
For all designated states
MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A.
Route Louis Braille 10
1763 Granges-Paccot / CH
Inventor(s)01 / MAILLET, Emilie
Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin
DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux
F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR
02 / GUZMAN, Guillaume
Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin
DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux
F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR
03 / BERRIOT, Julien
Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin
DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux
F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)Bocchi, Brigitte
Manufacture Française des
Pneumatiques Michelin
CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux
23, place des Carmes - Déchaux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
[2018/22]
Former [2015/18]Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date13729780.020.06.2013
[2018/22]
WO2013EP62932
Priority number, dateFR2012005586821.06.2012         Original published format: FR 1255868
[2015/18]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013190063
Date:27.12.2013
Language:FR
[2013/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2864425
Date:29.04.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013
[2015/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2864425
Date:30.05.2018
Language:FR
[2018/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:C09C1/44, C09C1/46, C09C1/56, C08K3/04, C08K9/02
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SILICABESCHICHTETEN SPEZIES AUF KOHLENSTOFFBASIS[2015/18]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING A SILICA-COVERED CARBON-BASED SPECIES[2015/18]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE ESPÈCE CARBONNÉE RECOUVERTE DE SILICE[2015/18]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2014National basic fee paid 
17.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/18]
24.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2018Fee for grant paid
12.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.01.2017
Opposition(s)01.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
IE20.06.2018
LU20.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
IE20.06.2018
LU20.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
IE20.06.2018
LU20.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/19]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
IE20.06.2018
LU20.06.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/17]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
LU20.06.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/09]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/08]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/03]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/52]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/51]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/50]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/49]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
NO30.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[XDI]WO9813428  (CABOT CORP [US]) [XD] 1,4,10 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 30 * * page 7, line 13 - line 20 * * page 10, line 19 - line 22 * * page 12, line 3 - line 7 * * page 13, line 3 - line 24 * [I] 2,3,5-9,11;
 [I]EP0799854  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-11 * page 3, line 39 - line 56 *;
 [A]WO0005312  (CABOT CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *