Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2858872

EP2858872 - SAFETY CONTROL DEVICE FOR CHAIRLIFT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.01.2020
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LST
74 voie Magellan
Parc d'activités Alpespace
73800 Sainte-Helene-du-Lac / FR
[2019/16]
Former [2015/16]For all designated states
Eurolase
ZA des Vernays
74210 Doussard / FR
Inventor(s)01 / REICHERT, Pascal
114 route de Crosaz
74210 Giez / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/16]01 / REICHERT, Pascal
114 route de Crosaz
F-74210 Giez / FR
Representative(s)Henck, Lilian
Cabinet Germain & Maureau
12, rue Boileau
69006 Lyon / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/16]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
L'Escurial - Technolpole Nancy Brabois
17, Avenue de la Forêt de Haye
54519 Vandoeuvre les Nancy Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date13730037.204.06.2013
WO2013FR51264
Priority number, dateFR2012005525406.06.2012         Original published format: FR 1255254
[2015/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013182803
Date:12.12.2013
Language:FR
[2013/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2858872
Date:15.04.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013
[2015/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:B61B12/00, B61B12/06
[2015/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/16]
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN SESSELLIFT[2015/16]
English:SAFETY CONTROL DEVICE FOR CHAIRLIFT[2015/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE DE SECURITE POUR TELESIEGE[2020/02]
Former [2015/16]DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE DE SÉCURITÉ POUR TÉLÉSIÈGE
Entry into regional phase19.12.2014National basic fee paid 
19.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/16]
07.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.06.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]FR2905337  (ADOUR VISION SYSTEM SOC PAR AC [FR], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [I] 8;
 [XI]US2004003751  (ALBRICH REINHARD [AT], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * the whole document * [I] 8;
 [A]EP2409888  (MERIBEL ALPINA SA [FR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2012172198  (POMAGALSKI SA [FR], et al) [XP] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantFR2901524
 FR2597054