Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2846813 Dossier alert: RSS

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 535
06.09.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
07.10.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.09.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.09.2016 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
22.09.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.09.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
22.09.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 72
14.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.07.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
14.07.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
14.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.07.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
04.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
04.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
04.07.2016 Description Search / examination 3
04.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.07.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
01.03.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.03.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.03.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.03.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 72
10.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
10.11.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 42
10.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
10.11.2015 Description Search / examination 42
10.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.11.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.07.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.07.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.07.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.04.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.03.2015 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
05.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
05.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
05.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
05.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.02.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.12.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
16.12.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.12.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.11.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
04.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.11.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.09.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
04.12.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 50
14.11.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
14.11.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 73
16.08.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
16.08.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
16.08.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
02.08.2013 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 3
17.06.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
17.06.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 4
17.06.2013 Description International Searching Authority 42
17.06.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 25