Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2846813


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.02.2018 [2018/06]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
08.09.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
28.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
21.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
14.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
23.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
16.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
26.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2017  [2017/26]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
30.09.2016 (Expected) grant published on  02.11.2016  [2016/44]
23.09.2016 New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent
23.09.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.07.2016 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.07.2016 Deletion: Payment of fee for grant
15.07.2016 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.07.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.07.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.02.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.02.2016 Change - classification published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
12.02.2016 Change - classification published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
12.02.2016 Change - German title published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
12.02.2016 Change - French title published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
12.11.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.07.2015 First examination report published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
17.07.2015 Change - extension states published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
02.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
13.02.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
13.02.2015 Request for examination filed published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
02.12.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication