Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2846813

EP2846813 - POLYSACCHARIDES FROM PRASINOCOCCALES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glycomar Limited
European Centre for Marine Biotechnology
Dunstaffnage Marine Lab
Dunbeg
Oban, Argyll PA37 1QA / GB
[2015/12]
Inventor(s)01 / BAVINGTON, Charles Daniel
8 Etive Park
North Connel
Oban Highland PA37 1SJ / GB
02 / MOSS, Claire
3D Burnbank Terrace
Breadalbane Street
Oban Argyll Highland PA34 5PB / GB
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)Thom, Russell
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2015/12]
Application number, filing date13730626.213.05.2013
[2016/44]
WO2013GB51223
Priority number, dateGB2012000832511.05.2012         Original published format: GB 201208325
[2015/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013167911
Date:14.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2846813
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2846813
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/44]
Search report(s)International search reportEP14.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/737, A61K36/05, A61K8/73, C08B37/00, C12P19/04, A61P37/00
[2016/11]
Former International [2015/12]A61K36/05
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYSACCHARIDE AUS PRASINOCOCCALES[2016/11]
English:POLYSACCHARIDES FROM PRASINOCOCCALES[2015/12]
French:POLYSACCHARIDES À PARTIR DE PRASINOCOCCALES[2016/11]
Former [2015/12]POLYSACCHARIDE AUS PRASINOCOCCUS
Former [2015/12]POLYSACCHARIDES PROVENANT DE PRASINOCOCCALES
Entry into regional phase04.11.2014National basic fee paid 
04.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/12]
05.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.07.2016Fee for grant paid
04.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.09.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
22.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.07.2015
Opposition(s)03.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
[2017/38]
Former [2017/37]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/36]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/35]AT02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV02.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]  - MCN SIEBURTH JOHN ET AL, "Widespread occurrence of the oceanic ultraplankter, Prasinococcus capsulatus (Prasinophyceae), the diagnostic "Golgi-decapore complex" and the newly described polysaccharide "capsulan"", JOURNAL OF PHYCOLOGY, (199910), vol. 35, no. 5, ISSN 0022-3646, pages 1032 - 1043, XP002704952 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1529-8817.1999.3551032.x
by applicantWO2011031161
 NO320950B
    - MIYASHITA ET AL., "Prasinococcus capsulatus Gen. Et Sp. Nov., A New Marine Coccoid Prasinophyte", J. GEN. APPL. MICROBIOL., (1993), vol. 39, pages 571 - 582,
    - MIYASHITA ET AL., "Composition and nature of extracellular polysaccharide produced by newly isolated coccoid prasinophyte, Prasinococcus capsulatus", J. MARINE BIOTECHNOL., (1995), vol. 3, pages 136 - 139,
    - HIGASHI ET AL., "Controlled photochemical depolymerization of K5 heparosan, a bioengineered heparin precursor", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, (2011), vol. 86, pages 1365 - 1370,
    - J. PHYCOL., (1999), vol. 35, pages 1032 - 1043,
    - GUILLARD R.; RYTHER J., "Studies of marine planktonic diatoms", CAN. J. MICROBIOL., (1962), vol. 8, pages 229 - 239,
    - ROTA C ET AL., "Free radical generation during chemical depolymerization of heparin", ANAL BIOCHEM., (2005), vol. 344, no. 2, pages 193 - 203,
    - PETIT AC ET AL., "Free-radical depolymerization with metallic catalysts of an exopolysaccharide produced by a bacterium isolated from a deep-sea hydrothermal vent polychaete annelid", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, (2006), vol. 64, doi:doi:10.1016/j.carbpol.2005.11.016, pages 597 - 602, XP025087723

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2005.11.016