Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2856202

EP2856202 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR LOCATION POSITIONING OF USER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NextNav, LLC
484 Oakmead Parkway
Sunnyvale CA 94085 / US
[2016/31]
Former [2015/15]For all designated states
Nextnav, LLC
484 Oakmead Parkway
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RAGHUPATHY, Arun
No. 14E, Asset Gardenia Enclave
Ramagondanahalli
Whitefield
Bangalore 560066 / IN
02 / PATTABIRAMAN, Ganesh
116 Charter Oaks Circle
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
03 / KUMAR, Shubham
B-504 Nagarjuna Maple Heights
Outer Ring Road
Mahadevapura
Bangalore 560016 / IN
04 / CLARK, Henry
202 Juneway Drive
Chittenango, 13037 / US
05 / SENDONARIS, Andrew
189 Smith Ranch Ct
Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US
06 / WILLHOFF, Steven
484 Oakmead Parkway
Sunnyvale CA 94085 / US
 [2016/51]
Former [2015/17]01 / RAGUPATHY, Arun
No. 14E, Asset Gardenia Enclave
Ramagondanahalli
Whitefield
Bangalore 560066 / IN
02 / PATTABIRAMAN, Ganesh
116 Charter Oaks Circle
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
03 / KUMAR, Shubham
B-504 Nagarjuna Maple Heights
Outer Ring Road
Mahadevapura
Bangalore 560016 / IN
04 / CLARK, Henry
202 Juneway Drive
Chittenango, 13037 / US
05 / SENDONARIS, Andrew
189 Smith Ranch Ct
Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US
06 / WILLHOFF, Steven
484 Oakmead Parkway
Sunnyvale CA 94085 / US
Former [2015/15]01 / RAGUPATHY, Arun
No. 14E, Asset Gardenia Enclave
Ramagondanahalli
Whitefield
Bangalore 560066 / IN
02 / PATTABIRAMAN, Ganesh
116 Charter Oaks Circle
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
03 / KUMAR, Shubham
B-504 Nagarjuna Maple Heights
Outer Ring Road
Mahadevapura
Bangalore 560016 / IN
04 / CLARK, Henry
202 Juneway Drive
Chittenango, 13037 / US
05 / SENDONARIS, Andrew
189 Smith Ranch Ct
Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US
06 / WILLHOFF, Steven
353 Maryanne Dr.
Stateline, Nevada 89449 / US
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2016/51]Brophy, David Timothy
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
Former [2015/15]Brophy, David Timothy
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date13730729.404.06.2013
[2016/51]
WO2013US44147
Priority number, dateUS201261655787P05.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261655787 P
US201361786467P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361786467 P
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013184701
Date:12.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2856202
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013
[2015/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2856202
Date:21.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01S5/02, G01S19/10, G01S19/46
[2015/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR STANDORTBESTIMMUNG EINER BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG[2015/15]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR LOCATION POSITIONING OF USER DEVICE[2015/15]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR UN POSITIONNEMENT DE LOCALISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF UTILISATEUR[2015/15]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2015National basic fee paid 
05.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/15]
01.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2016Fee for grant paid
14.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16193385.8  / EP3139193
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2016
Opposition(s)22.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
GB04.06.2017
IE04.06.2017
LU04.06.2017
MT04.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
FR30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/29]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
GB04.06.2017
IE04.06.2017
LU04.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
FR30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/21]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
GB04.06.2017
LU04.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/11]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV21.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[XDYI]US8130141  (PATTABIRAMAN GANESH [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,17 * column 7, line 10 - column 16, line 32; figure 3 * [Y] 3-9,13-16 [I] 18-24;
 [XY]US6525688  (CHOU ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 67; figures 2,3 * [Y] 3-9,13-16;
 [A]US2011227790  (LI JIN [US], et al) [A] 19 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2008069712  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 13,20-23 * page 16, line 5 - page 21, line 12 *
 [XI]  - "Extended GPS Navigation Bits Message", vol. TSGC, (20040116), pages 1 - 19, 3GPP2 DRAFT; C16-20040112-005 QCOM NAV BIT MSG, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT 2, 3GPP2, 2500 WILSON BOULEVARD, SUITE 300, ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA 22201 ; USA, URL: http://ftp.3gpp2.org/TSGC/Working/2004/2004-01-Portland/TSG-C-2004-01-Portland/WG1/SWG16/, (20040116), XP062049825 [X] 1,2,17 * Table 3.2.1.2.2; pages 3-7, 3-8 * [I] 18,20-24
 [XI]  - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Location Services (LCS); Mobile Station (MS) - Serving Mobile Location Centre (SMLC) Radio Resource LCS Protocol (RRLP) (3GPP TS 44.031 version 10.0.0 Release 10)", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20110501), vol. 3GPP GERAN 2, no. V10.0.0, XP014066483 [X] 1,2,17 * page 53 - page 141 * [I] 18-24
by applicantWO2012US44452