EP2861407 - METHOD FOR REINFORCING AND/OR LINING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/17] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REINFORCING AND/OR LINING MATERIAL | ||
[2020/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Woodwelding AG Mühlebach 2 6362 Stansstad / CH | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAYER, Jörg Lerchenweg 6 CH-5702 Niederlenz / CH | 02 /
AESCHLIMANN, Marcel Dorfgasse 65 CH-2514 Ligerz / CH | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2015/17] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 13731264.1 | 12.06.2013 | [2020/38] | WO2013CH00102 | Priority number, date | US201261659547P | 14.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261659547 P | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013185251 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2861407 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2861407 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/08, B29C65/02, B29C63/00, B29C63/34, // B29L7/00, B29K101/12 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
B29C65/08 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B29C63/0069 (EP);
B29C63/341 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C65/1412 (EP,RU,US);
B29C65/1609 (EP,RU,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,RU,US);
B29C65/34 (US);
B29C65/3404 (RU);
B29C65/3412 (KR,US);
B29C65/3476 (KR,US);
B29C65/7437 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B29C65/7443 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/02242 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B29C66/032 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/21 (EP,US);
B29C66/3022 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/30326 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/304 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/348 (EP,US);
B29C66/474 (EP,US);
B29C66/721 (US);
B29C66/723 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C66/7392 (EP,US);
B29C66/746 (EP);
B29C66/7463 (EP);
B29C66/7486 (EP);
B29C66/7487 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
E04B1/92 (US);
F16B5/01 (RU);
B29C65/06 (EP,US);
B29C65/0681 (EP,US);
B29C65/081 (EP,US);
B29C65/1409 (EP,US);
B29C65/1487 (EP,US);
B29C65/1612 (EP,US);
B29C65/1674 (EP,US);
B29C65/1687 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,US);
B29C66/72141 (EP,US);
B29C66/72143 (EP,US);
B29C66/73161 (EP,US);
B29C66/7461 (EP,US);
B29C66/9512 (EP,US);
B29C66/9513 (EP,US);
B29C66/9516 (EP,US);
B29C66/9517 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/08 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2033/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2055/02 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2059/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2071/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2079/085 (US,EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2277/10 (US,EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2307/04 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2020/15] | B29C65/02, B29C65/08 | ||
Former IPC [2015/17] | B29C65/08, B29C65/34, F16B5/01, B29C65/06, B29C65/14, B29C65/16, B29C65/18, B29C65/74 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG UND/ODER AUSKLEIDUNG EINES MATERIALS | [2020/15] | English: | METHOD FOR REINFORCING AND/OR LINING MATERIAL | [2020/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RENFORCEMENT ET/OU DE REVÊTEMENT DE MATÉRIAU | [2020/15] |
Former [2015/17] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG UND/ODER AUSKLEIDUNG EINES MATERIALS | ||
Former [2015/17] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REINFORCING AND/OR LINING MATERIAL | ||
Former [2015/17] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RENFORCEMENT ET/OU DE REVÊTEMENT DE MATÉRIAU | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 31.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2013 | AL | 16.09.2020 | CY | 16.09.2020 | DK | 16.09.2020 | EE | 16.09.2020 | FI | 16.09.2020 | HR | 16.09.2020 | LT | 16.09.2020 | LV | 16.09.2020 | MC | 16.09.2020 | NL | 16.09.2020 | RO | 16.09.2020 | RS | 16.09.2020 | SE | 16.09.2020 | SI | 16.09.2020 | SK | 16.09.2020 | SM | 16.09.2020 | BG | 16.12.2020 | NO | 16.12.2020 | GR | 17.12.2020 | IS | 16.01.2021 | PT | 18.01.2021 | IE | 12.06.2021 | LU | 12.06.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 12.06.2013 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 12.06.2021 | ||
LU | 12.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 12.06.2021 | ||
LU | 12.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 12.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | EE | 16.09.2020 | |
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 16.09.2020 | |
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
NO | 16.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2008080238 (WOODWELDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * claim 1 * * pages 1-4 * * pages 17-18 * [A] 2-11; | [XAI]WO2009052644 (WOODWELDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,31,33,35,37 * abstract * * figures 3,9, 15-17 * * pages 20-36 * [A] 5-11,32,36[I] 34; | [XAI]WO2010045751 (WW TECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-7,31-33,35-37 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * pages 15-27 * [A] 8-11 [I] 34 | Examination | WO2008080238 | WO2009052644 | WO2010045751 | by applicant | US2002056707 | US2003159294 | US2005042456 | US6913666 | US7160405 | US7172420 | US7727658 | US8314359 |