Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2859633

EP2859633 - DEVICE WITH A CHARGE SEALING LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/16]DEVICE COMPRISING A SPACE CHARGE TRAPPING LAYER
[2016/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nexans
8, rue du Général Foy
75008 Paris / FR
[2015/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SAUGRAIN, Jean-Maxime
3 allée Claude Debussy
F-78110 Le Vesinet / FR
02 / MIREBEAU, Pierre
21 rue Jean-Baptiste COROT
F-91140 Villebon sur Yvette / FR
 [2015/16]
Representative(s)Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63 avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/32]Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63 Avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Former [2015/16]Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon Feray Lenne Conseil
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Application number, filing date13731401.907.06.2013
[2016/32]
WO2013FR51328
Priority number, dateFR2012005535208.06.2012         Original published format: FR 1255352
[2015/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013182829
Date:12.12.2013
Language:FR
[2013/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2859633
Date:15.04.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013
[2015/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2859633
Date:10.08.2016
Language:FR
[2016/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02G15/184, H02G15/107
[2015/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER LADUNGSBLOCKIERUNGSSCHICHT[2016/11]
English:DEVICE WITH A CHARGE SEALING LAYER[2016/11]
French:DISPOSITIF COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE PIÉGEUSE DE CHARGES D'ESPACE[2015/16]
Former [2015/16]VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER RAUMLADUNGSABFANGENDEN SCHICHT
Former [2015/16]DEVICE COMPRISING A SPACE CHARGE TRAPPING LAYER
Entry into regional phase08.01.2015National basic fee paid 
08.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
16.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2016Fee for grant paid
13.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2016
Opposition(s)11.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.06.2013
AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MK10.08.2016
MT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
[2019/51]
Former [2019/48]HU07.06.2013
AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2019/31]HU07.06.2013
AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/46]AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/43]AT10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/11]AT10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/32]AT10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT10.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2010149229  (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]; JEROENSE MARC [SE]; CHRISTEN THOMAS [CH]; JONSS) [X] 1,2,5-9 * the whole document *;
 [XI]EP0660483  (EUROMOLD [BE]) [X] 3,4,10,11,15,16,18-22 * the whole document * [I] 12-14,17;
 [A]FR2736218  (ALCATEL CABLE [FR]) [A] 1,3,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR1077452  (DAVID CHANDLER PRINCE [US]) [A] 1,3,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1280167  (NEXANS [FR]) [A] 1,3,5 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1-3 *