Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2856797

EP2856797 - DEVICE-TO-DEVICE (D2D) LINK ADAPTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.11.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]For all designated states
Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PELLETIER, Benoit
11-13th Street
Roxboro, QC H8Y 1L3 / CA
02 / MARINIER, Paul
1805 Stravinski
Brossard, QC J4X 2J7 / CA
03 / SHENG, Hongsan
665 Sunderland Avenue
Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US
04 / VANGANURU, Kiran, K.
3000 Valley Forge Circle
Apartement 1150
King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US
05 / PANI, Diana
730 Lusignan
Apartment 4
Montreal, QC H3C 1Y9 / CA
 [2015/15]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]Johansson, Magnus
Awapatent AB
Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Application number, filing date13731993.530.05.2013
WO2013US43367
Priority number, dateUS201261653523P31.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261653523 P
US201361798356P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361798356 P
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013181394
Date:05.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2856797
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013
[2015/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/10, H04W76/14, H04L5/00
[2019/03]
Former International [2015/15]H04W24/10, H04W76/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG-ZU-VORRICHTUNG (D2D)-VERBINDUNGSANPASSUNG[2015/15]
English:DEVICE-TO-DEVICE (D2D) LINK ADAPTATION[2015/15]
French:ADAPTATION D'UNE LIAISON DE COMMUNICATION ENTRE DISPOSITIFS (D2D)[2015/15]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2014National basic fee paid 
19.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/15]
08.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2018Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
25.09.2018Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
22.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
29.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US2011275382  (HAKOLA SAMI-JUKKA [FI], et al) [X] 1-26 * paragraphs [0025] , [ 0026] , [ 0048] - [0050] - [ 0052] , [ 0053] , [ 0054] * * figures 1, 3a, 4 *;
 [A]US2011305179  (WANG RENQIU [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraphs [0047] , [0049] , [0060] , [0106] *;
 [A]US2012044815  (GEIRHOFER STEFAN [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0054] , [0057] , [0065] , [0068] , [0069] *;
 [AP]WO2013067685  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [AP] 1-26 * abstract * * page 3, line 8 - line 30 * * page 9, line 5 - page 11, line 15 * * figures 3,4 *;
 [E]WO2013100831  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [E] 1-26 * abstract * * page 7, line 26 - line 31 * * page 12, line 1 - page 18, line 5 *
 [A]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "CSI-RS configuration and signalling", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-112902 CSI-RS CONFIGURATION AND SIGNALING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111004), vol. RAN WG1, no. Zhuhai; 20111010, XP050538114 [A] 1-26 * the whole document *