Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2864830

EP2864830 - MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.03.2015
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH
CPTD
Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37
35578 Wetzlar / DE
[2015/18]
Inventor(s)01 / SIECKMANN, Frank
Frankenstrasse 11
75031 Eppingen / DE
02 / HUBER, Stefan
Torweg 26
69250 Schönau / DE
 [2015/41]
Former [2015/37]01 / SIECKMANN, Frank
Hörsterholz 11
75031 Eppingen / DE
02 / HUBER, Stefan
Torweg 26
69250 Schönau / DE
Former [2015/18]01 / SIECKMANN, Frank
Hörsterholz 1d
44879 Bochum / DE
02 / HUBER, Stefan
Torweg 26
69250 Schönau / DE
Representative(s)Bradl, Joachim
Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents
+ Trademarks Department
Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37
35578 Wetzlar / DE
[2015/18]
Application number, filing date13732430.720.06.2013
WO2013EP62925
Priority number, dateDE20121010548422.06.2012         Original published format: DE102012105484
[2015/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013190058
Date:27.12.2013
Language:DE
[2013/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2864830
Date:29.04.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013
[2015/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02B21/00
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
TitleGerman:MIKROSKOP[2015/18]
English:MICROSCOPE[2015/18]
French:MICROSCOPE[2015/18]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2015National basic fee paid 
22.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201503   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2015
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2007022961  (OLYMPUS SOFT IMAGING SOLUTIONS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 8 * [I] 4-7,10,11;
 [A]US2009168160  (GUINEY PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 6,7 *;
 [AD]DE10237470  (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * figure 1 *