Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2858846 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2858846



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 243
08.04.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
28.02.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.02.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
15.02.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.11.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.11.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.11.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.11.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
02.11.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
28.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
28.09.2018 Description Search / examination 1
28.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.09.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
27.09.2018 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 3
20.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.09.2018 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.09.2018 RO101 Declaration Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.05.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.05.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
24.05.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
08.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
08.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
08.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.11.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
28.08.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
23.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.08.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.04.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
28.04.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.08.2016 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.08.2016 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
17.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
29.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.07.2015 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 4
18.03.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
28.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.01.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
12.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.01.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.01.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
24.10.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.01.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
19.12.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.12.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 20
25.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
25.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
25.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
11.06.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
11.06.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 2
11.06.2013 Description International Searching Authority 16
11.06.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 2