Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2858846


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019 [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
22.02.2019 (Expected) grant published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
19.02.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
19.02.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
19.02.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.11.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.10.2018 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.09.2018 Change - inventor published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
25.05.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.05.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.05.2018 Change - inventor
10.11.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.08.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.05.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.04.2017 First examination report
17.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.10.2015 Change - representative
14.08.2015 Change - extension states published on  16.09.2015  [2015/38]
29.07.2015 Amendment by applicant
02.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.03.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
13.03.2015 Request for examination filed published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
12.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
23.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2015 Change - representative
13.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
09.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication