Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2858846

EP2858846 - ADJUSTMENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING SHUTOFF ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, CZ, EE, RO, SK
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MCi (Mirror Controls International) Netherlands B.V.
Pompmolenlaan 29
3447 GK Woerden / NL
[2015/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BOOM, Stephen Alexander George Gustavo
c/o MCi (Mirror Controls International)
Netherlands B.V.
Pompmolenlaan 29
3447 GK Woerden / NL
02 / HUIJZERS, Bastiaan
c/o MCi (Mirror Controls International)
Netherlands B.V.
Pompmolenlaan 29
3447 GK Woerden / NL
03 / DE VRIES, Hendrik Alfred Simeon
c/o MCi (Mirror Controls International)
Netherlands B.V.
Pompmolenlaan 29
3447 GK Woerden / NL
 [2018/43]
Former [2015/16]01 / BOOM, Stephen Alexander George Gustavo
c/o MCI (Mirror Controls International)
Netherlands B.V.
Pompmolenlaan 29
NL-3447 GK Woerden / NL
02 / HUIJZERS, Bastiaan
c/o MCi (Mirror Controls International)
Netherlands B.V.
Pompmolenlaan 29
NL-3447 GK Woerden / NL
03 / DE VRIES, Erik Alfred Simeon
c/o MCi (Mirror Controls International)
Netherlands B.V.
Pompmolenlaan 29
NL-3447 GK Woerden / NL
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2019/13]
Former [2015/16]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13733080.911.06.2013
[2019/13]
WO2013NL50414
Priority number, dateNL2012200899012.06.2012         Original published format: NL 2008990
[2015/16]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013187760
Date:19.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2858846
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013
[2015/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2858846
Date:27.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60K11/08, H02K7/116, F24F13/14
[2015/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG VON SPERRELEMENTEN[2015/16]
English:ADJUSTMENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING SHUTOFF ELEMENTS[2015/16]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'AJUSTEMENT D'ÉLÉMENTS DE FERMETURE[2015/16]
Entry into regional phase12.01.2015National basic fee paid 
12.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
29.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2019Fee for grant paid
15.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL27.03.2019
CZ27.03.2019
EE27.03.2019
ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RO27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
SK27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
PT27.07.2019
[2019/49]
Former [2019/48]ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
PT27.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP2325035  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,8 * paragraphs [0027] , [0029] - [0036]; figure - * [Y] 5-7;
 [YA]DE19719991  (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [Y] 5-7 * column 3, lines 14-37; figure . * [A] 1
by applicantEP2325035