Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800519

EP2800519 - GENDER-SPECIFIC IDENTIFICATION OF SPERM CELLS AND EMBRYOS USING LOCKED NUCLEIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.05.2018  [2018/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MofA Group LLC
117 East Green Bay Street
P.O. Box 469
Shawano, WI 54166-0469 / US
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / DIDION, Bradley
117 East Green Bay Street
P.O. Box 469
Shawano, WI 54166-0469 / US
02 / VERSTEGEN, John
117 East Green Bay Street
P.O. Box 469
Shawano, WI 54166-0469 / US
03 / HRDLICKA, Patrick
117 East Green Bay Street
P.O. Box 469
Shawano, WI 54166-0469 / US
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Geyer, Fehners & Partner
Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date13733607.903.01.2013
WO2013US20139
Priority number, dateUS201261583977P06.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261583977 P
US201261673197P18.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261673197 P
US201261673715P19.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261673715 P
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013103713
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800519
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B10/00, C12N5/071, C12Q1/68
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/46]A61B10/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:GESCHLECHTSSPEZIFISCHE IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON SAMENZELLEN UND EMBRYONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GESPERRTEM NUKLEINSÄUREN[2014/46]
English:GENDER-SPECIFIC IDENTIFICATION OF SPERM CELLS AND EMBRYOS USING LOCKED NUCLEIC ACIDS[2014/46]
French:IDENTIFICATION PAR SEXE DE SPERMATOZOÏDES ET D'EMBRYONS AU MOYEN D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES BLOQUÉS[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Search fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
22.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/20]
10.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/20]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
18.01.2017Request for further processing filed
18.01.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.02.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2009079456  (MINITUBE AMERICA INC [US]; DIDION BRADLEY [US]; ERWIN WHITNEY [US]; BL) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 22; claims 1,2 *;
 [Y]  - RANDALL BEANE ET AL, "Recognition of Chromosomal DNA inside Cells by Locked Nucleic Acids +", BIOCHEMISTRY, (20081216), vol. 47, no. 50, doi:10.1021/bi801930p, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 13147 - 13149, XP055198555 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi801930p
International search[Y]US2010311059  (DIDION ET AL);
 [Y]US2009317817  (OETH ET AL);
 [A]US2010190172  (CARGILL ET AL)
 [Y]  - SAU ET AL., "Invader LNA Efficient Targeting of Short Double Stranded DNA.", ORG BIOMOL CHEM., (201005), vol. 8, no. 9, pages 2028 - 2036., XP055078396

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b923465a