Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801365

EP2801365 - USES OF DANSHEN OR DANSHEN PREPARATION IN PREPARATION OF DRUGS FOR TREATING DISEASES RELATED TO HEPATIC FIBROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tasly Pharmaceutical Group Co., Ltd.
Tasly Modern TCM Garden
Pu Jihe East Road No. 2
Beichen District
Tianjin 300410 / CN
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHU, Yonghong
Tasly ModernTCM Garden
Pu Jihe East Road No. 2
Beichen District
Tianjin 300410 / CN
02 / HU, Jinfang
Tasly Modern TCM Garden
Pu Jihe East Road No. 2
Beichen District
Tianjin 300410 / CN
03 / MA, Jie
Tasly Modern TCM Garden
Pu Jihe East Road No. 2
Beichen District
Tianjin 300410 / CN
04 / SHEN, Xiuping
Tasly Modern TCM Garden
Pu Jihe East Road No. 2
Beichen District
Tianjin 300410 / CN
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date13733640.004.01.2013
WO2013CN70037
Priority number, dateCN2012100055704.01.2012         Original published format: CN201210000557
[2014/46]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013102437
Date:11.07.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801365
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/537, A61K31/045, A61P1/16, A61P35/00, A61K125/00
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON DANSHEN ODER EINES DANSHEN-PRÄPARATS BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON ARZNEIMITTELN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT LEBERFIBROSE[2014/46]
English:USES OF DANSHEN OR DANSHEN PREPARATION IN PREPARATION OF DRUGS FOR TREATING DISEASES RELATED TO HEPATIC FIBROSIS[2014/46]
French:UTILISATIONS DE DANSHEN (SAUGE ROUGE) OU DE PRÉPARATION À BASE DE DANSHEN DANS L'ÉLABORATION DES MÉDICAMENTS PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LES MALADIES LIÉES À UNE FIBROSE HÉPATIQUE.[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014Translation filed 
03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Search fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
09.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
23.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003152651  (YAN XIJUN [CN], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0040] , [ 133] * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0164] * * paragraph [0335] - paragraph [0338] * * paragraph [0903] - paragraph [0930] * [I] 1-10
 [XI]  - WANG XIHONG ET AL, "New developments in the chemistry and biology of the bioactive constituents of Tanshen", MEDICINAL RESEARCH REVIEWS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 27, no. 1, doi:10.1002/MED.20077, ISSN 0198-6325, (20070101), pages 133 - 148, (20060803), XP002625359 [X] 1-10 * page 135 - page 136 * * page 138, paragraph 5 * [I] 1-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/med.20077
International search[X]CN101596202  (SICHUAN SIDAKANG PHARMACEUTICA [CN]);
 [X]CN1839819  (HAIKOU LUKE SOUTHERN MEDICINE [CN]);
 [X]CN1563075  (ZHENGDA TIANQING MEDICINES IND [CN]);
 [X]CN1759855  (HENGXIN MEDICINES INSTT HEFEI [CN])
by applicant   - ADRIAN JE; POELSTRA K; SCHERPHOF GL ET AL., "Effects of a new bioactive lipid-based drug carrier on cultured hepatic stellate cells and liver fibrosis in bile duct-ligated rats [J].", J PHANNACOL EXP THER, (2007), vol. 321, no. 2, pages 536 - 543
    - PRUD HOME GJ., "Pathobiology of transforming growth factor beta in cancer,fibrosis and immunologic disease, and therapeutic consideration [J", LAB INVEST, (2007), vol. 87, no. 11, pages 1077 - 1091
    - SONG M; SONG Z; BARVE S ET AL., "Tetrathiomolybdate protects against bile duct ligation-induced cholestatic liver injury and fibrosis [J", J PHARMACOL EXP THER, (2008), vol. 325, no. 2, pages 409 - 416
    - MIAO XD; YAN J; YING BZ ET AL., "Emodin protects rat liver from CCL4-induced fibrogenesis via inhibition of hepatic stellate cells activation [J", WORLD J GASTROENTEROL, (2009), vol. 15, no. 38, pages 4753 - 4762
    - ZOU YH; YANG Y; LI J; WU Q ET AL., "Potential therapeutic effects of a traditional Chinese formulation, BJ-JN, on liver fibrosis induced by carbon tetrachloride in rats [J", J ETHNOPHARMACOL, (2008), vol. 120, no. 3, pages 452 - 457
    - YUAN LP; CHEN FH; LING L ET AL., "Protective effects of total flavonoids of Bidens bipinnata L. against carbon tetrachloride-induced liver fibrosis in rats [J", J PHARM PHARMACOL, (2008), vol. 60, no. 10, pages 1393 - 1402
    - QIN Y; YAN L; TANG L ET AL., "Effect of tanshinone IIA on collagen expression in liver tissue of hepatic fibrosis ras [J", LISHIZHEN MEDICINE AND MATERIA MEDICA RESEARCH, (2010), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 782 - 784
    - CHEN H; ZHANG JH; LIU WQ, "Effect of curcumin for anti-schistosomiasis hepatic fibrosis and the experimental study of its mechanism [J", CHINESE TRADITIONAL AND HERBAL DRUGS, (2010), vol. 40, no. 8, pages 1274 - 1277
    - CAI WM; ZHANG BB; WENG HL ET AL., "Comparison study of eight markers of hepatic fibrosis serum [J", CHINESE JOURNAL OF HEPATOLOGY, (2004), vol. 12, no. 4, page 219
    - CHEN LY, "Dynamic effect of ShuGanRuanJian Decoction on NAG of hepatic fibrosis rats [J", JOURNAL OF SHANXI COLLEGE OF TRADITIONAL CHINESE MEDICINE, (2003), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 13 - 14
    - WANG GS; HAN ZW, "Effect of glycyrrhiza flavonoids on liver damage caused by ethanol [J", ACTA PHARMACOLOGICA SINICA, (1993), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 271 - 274
    - ZHOU CY; AI LY; WANG M ET AL., "Experimental study of Eucommia polysaccharide for anti hepatic fibrosis [J", CHINESE TRADITIONAL AND HERBAL DRUGS, (2011), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 324 - 329