Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801014

EP2801014 - COMPUTER MOUSE WITH ADJUSTABLE TOP PART [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gunnar Drougge AB
Åsögatan 180
116 32 Stockholm / SE
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / DROUGGE, Gunnar
Åsögatan 180
S-116 32 Stockholm / SE
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Strandvejen 70
2900 Hellerup / DK
[2019/10]
Former [2014/46]Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S
Rued Langgaards Vej 8
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
Application number, filing date13733677.202.01.2013
[2019/10]
WO2013SE00001
Priority number, dateSE2012000002005.01.2012         Original published format: SE 1200020
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013103315
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2801014
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801014
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE17.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0354
[2015/34]
Former International [2014/46]G06F3/033
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:COMPUTERMAUS MIT VERSTELLBAREM OBEREM TEIL[2014/46]
English:COMPUTER MOUSE WITH ADJUSTABLE TOP PART[2014/46]
French:SOURIS D'ORDINATEUR À PARTIE SUPÉRIEURE AJUSTABLE[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Search fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
15.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
24.01.2019Fee for grant paid
24.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.06.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
24.01.2019Request for further processing filed
24.01.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.02.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
[2019/47]
Former [2019/46]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5260696  (MAYNARD JR STUART T [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 8, line 12 - column 9, line 2; figures 6, 7A-7C * [I] 2,5;
 [XI]US5870081  (WU ARTHUR [TW]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 21; figures 6a-6d, 7a-7c * [I] 3,5,6
International search[X]US5870081  (WU ARTHUR);
 [A]WO2010107800  (ERGOWERX INTERNATIONAL LLC ET AL);
 [A]US2006170655  (HOU CHUAN-KUNG ET AL);
 [A]US2005030278  (FU LIANG)