Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801944

EP2801944 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING ADVERTISEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 08.03.2017  [2017/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / KANG, Hyeon-Jin
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
Seoul 137-773Suwon-shi Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
02 / MOON, Sang-Jun
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
Seoul 137-773Suwon-shi Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
03 / PARK, Yong-Seok
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
Seoul 137-773Suwon-shi Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date13733711.903.01.2013
WO2013KR00021
Priority number, dateKR2012000186306.01.2012         Original published format: KR 20120001863
[2014/46]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013103241
Date:11.07.2013
Language:KO
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801944
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/00, H04N21/433, G06Q30/02
[2015/18]
Former International [2014/46]G06Q30/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON WERBUNG[2014/46]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING ADVERTISEMENT[2014/46]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À FOURNIR UNE PUBLICITÉ[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2014Translation filed 
31.07.2014National basic fee paid 
31.07.2014Search fee paid 
31.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
10.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/10]
21.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/10]
20.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008271069  (KIM YOUNG MIN [KR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraph [0023]; figure - * [I] 3-7,9-14;
 [I]US2010107191  (FENG XIN [US] ET AL) [I] 1-14 * figure -; claim - * * paragraph [0009] *
International search[Y]KR20080052025  (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE);
 [Y]KR20080024300  (FEELINGK CO., LTD.);
 [Y]KR20100107546  (FEELINGK CO., LTD.);
 [A]KR20100019760  (KT CORPORATION);
 [A]KR100923780B  (KIM, JUNG-HWAN)