Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800943

EP2800943 - STEALTH WINDOW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eltics Ltd
P.O. Box 5333
75151 Rishon LeZion / IL
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / MEIR, Ronen
50 Bikurei Anavim
Ashkelon / IL
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date13733801.808.01.2013
WO2013IL00002
Priority number, dateIL2012021742308.01.2012         Original published format: IL 21742312
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013102896
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800943
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL11.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:F41H3/00, G02B26/08, // F41G7/22
[2019/47]
Former International [2015/35]F41H3/00, G02B5/08, G02B5/02, // F41G7/22
Former International [2014/46]F41H3/00, G02B5/08, G02B5/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:TARNFENSTER[2014/46]
English:STEALTH WINDOW[2014/46]
French:FENÊTRE FURTIVE[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase05.08.2014National basic fee paid 
05.08.2014Search fee paid 
05.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
17.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XAI]GB2274154  (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,5-9 * page 1, first paragraph * * page 2, last paragraph - page 5, fifth paragraph * * page 7, fifth paragraph - page 8, first paragraph * * page 9, third paragraph - page 14, last paragraph * * figures 1, 4-7 * [A] 2 [I] 4,10-12;
 [A]US8013302  (MEIR RONEN [IL]) [A] 1,3-12 * column 1, lines 6-10 * * column 4, lines 3-17 * * column 5, line 44 - column 8, line 30 * * column 9, line 35 - column 10, line 3 * * figures 1-5, 10a *
International search[Y]GB2274154  (HUNTER);
 [Y]US8013302  (MEIR R.);
 [Y]US6613420  (LEUPOLZ);
 [Y]US6753075  (LEUPOLZ);
 [YP]US2012185109  (OISON);
 [A]US4659089  (ROSA);
 [A]WO2009112810  (O'KEEFE)